Global Patent Index - EP 1058783 A1

EP 1058783 A1 2000-12-13 - RADIAL PISTON PUMP FOR SUPPLYING FUEL AT HIGH PRESSURE

Title (en)

RADIAL PISTON PUMP FOR SUPPLYING FUEL AT HIGH PRESSURE

Title (de)

RADIALKOLBENPUMPE ZUR KRAFTSTOFFHOCHDRUCKVERSORGUNG

Title (fr)

POMPE A PISTONS RADIAUX POUR L'ALIMENTATION HAUTE PRESSION EN CARBURANT

Publication

EP 1058783 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98952547 A

Priority

  • DE 9802611 W
  • DE 19744577 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19744577A1] The device has a back pressure valve (68) on the high pressure side. Except for a valve body (78) engaging on a sealing seat (76), the valve is a preassembled modular unit (88), fitted into an installation aperture (74). It is tensioned against a pump component (16) to form a high pressure seal. The modular unit has a closure element (90) with an outer thread (92) screwed into an inner thread (86) of the installation aperture.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 59/46; F04B 53/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 59/06 (2006.01); F02M 59/46 (2006.01); F04B 1/04 (2006.01); F04B 53/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 1/0448 (2013.01); F02M 59/462 (2013.01); F04B 53/1007 (2013.01); Y10T 137/7928 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9919621A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19744577 A1 19990422; EP 1058783 A1 20001213; EP 1058783 B1 20020410; JP 2001520349 A 20011030; JP 4235358 B2 20090311; US 6332761 B1 20011225; WO 9919621 A1 19990422

INPADOC legal status


2013-09-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59803797

- Effective date: 20130403

2013-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130403

2011-09-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20091005

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100904

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100930

2011-06-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100904

2011-05-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100904

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20101126

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090923

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090922

- Year of fee payment: 12

2003-04-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030113

2002-08-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-07-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020705

2002-05-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59803797 20020516

2002-04-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010730

2000-12-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000509

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT