Global Patent Index - EP 1058784 A1

EP 1058784 A1 2000-12-13 - DAMPER ELEMENT FOR A FUEL SUPPLY SYSTEM

Title (en)

DAMPER ELEMENT FOR A FUEL SUPPLY SYSTEM

Title (de)

DÄMPFERELEMENT FÜR EIN KRAFTSTOFFVERSORGUNGSSYSTEM

Title (fr)

ELEMENT AMORTISSEUR POUR SYSTEME D'ALIMENTATION EN CARBURANT

Publication

EP 1058784 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98965588 A

Priority

  • DE 9803441 W
  • DE 19807702 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19807702A1] The system contains a fuel distributor (2) to supply fuel to injection valves via valve intakes (3). The damper element has an elastic tubular body (1) located in the distributor. The tubular body separates an inner fuel chamber (1a) with fuel flowing through it, from an outer chamber (2a), which is connected to the fuel intakes and also has fuels flowing through it. The wall of the tubular body is of an elastic material, e.g. rubber, plastic, and/or an elastic fluid-proof fabric. The inner chamber is positioned upstream of a pressure regulator (6).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 69/46; F02M 55/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 55/02 (2006.01); F02M 55/04 (2006.01); F02M 69/46 (2006.01); F02M 69/54 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 69/465 (2013.01); F02M 55/04 (2013.01); F02M 61/166 (2013.01); F02M 2200/315 (2013.01); F02M 2200/9015 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9943953A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19807702 A1 19990826; BR 9815685 A 20001024; CZ 20003079 A3 20010516; CZ 291330 B6 20030212; EP 1058784 A1 20001213; EP 1058784 B1 20020220; JP 2002505401 A 20020219; US 6431149 B1 20020813; WO 9943953 A1 19990902

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-08-18 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59803156

- Effective date: 20110531

2010-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100121

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-11-23 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051123

2005-09-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050729

2005-07-13 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20041123

2004-11-23 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041123

2003-11-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20031119

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-11-03 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20031103

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-02-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20021121

2002-07-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-05-29 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020503

2002-03-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59803156 20020328

2002-02-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010606

2000-12-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000925

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT