Global Patent Index - EP 1058785 A1

EP 1058785 A1 2000-12-13 - DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING A MOTOR VEHICLE STARTER

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING A MOTOR VEHICLE STARTER

Title (de)

STEUERVORRICHTUNG FÜR ANLASSER EINES KRAFTFAHRZEUGES

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR LA COMMANDE D'UN DEMARREUR DE VEHICULE AUTOMOBILE

Publication

EP 1058785 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99961159 A

Priority

  • FR 9903271 W
  • FR 9816327 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2787946A1] The invention concerns a device for controlling the power supply of an electric motor (M) of a vehicle, particularly a motor vehicle, starter (D), comprising a power switch (K) mounted in series with said electric motor (M), means (2, B) for controlling said power switch (K), and an auxiliary switch (T2) which shorts out said electric motor when the power switch opens. The invention is characterised in that said auxiliary switch is a static electronic component (T2).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02N 11/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02N 11/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02N 15/003 (2013.01); F02N 11/0859 (2013.01); F02N 11/087 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0039453A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2787946 A1 20000630; FR 2787946 B1 20010323; BR 9908185 A 20001024; CN 1107799 C 20030507; CN 1292849 A 20010425; DE 69905239 D1 20030313; DE 69905239 T2 20031106; EP 1058785 A1 20001213; EP 1058785 B1 20030205; ES 2192875 T3 20031016; US 6486625 B1 20021126; WO 0039453 A1 20000706

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-11-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081223

2010-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081224

2010-03-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20081224

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081223

2009-08-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20081223

2008-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20071214

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-02-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20071224

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-01-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20071218

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-01-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031106

2003-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2192875 T3

2003-10-01 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 1058785E

2003-06-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030508

2003-03-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69905239 P 20030313

2003-03-05 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2003-02-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2003-02-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-05-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020408

2001-03-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001229

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE