Global patent index - EP 1058795 A1

EP 1058795 A1 2000-12-13 - ACTUATING UNIT FOR AN ELECTROMECHANICALLY OPERABLE DISC BRAKE

Title (en)

ACTUATING UNIT FOR AN ELECTROMECHANICALLY OPERABLE DISC BRAKE

Title (de)

BETÄTIGUNGSEINHEIT FÜR EINE ELEKTROMECHANISCH BETÄTIGBARE SCHEIBENBREMSE

Title (fr)

UNITE D'ACTIONNEMENT POUR FREIN A DISQUE A ACTIONNEMENT ELECTROMECANIQUE

Publication

EP 1058795 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99914477 A

Priority

  • DE 19809362 A
  • EP 9901423 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9945292A1] The invention relates to an actuating unit for an electromechanically operable disc brake for motor vehicles. The actuating unit is comprised of a driving unit (1) or an electric motor (11), and an actuating element (15) by means of which one (4) of two friction linings (4, 5), said linings being arranged in a brake caliper such that they can be displaced, is brought into contact with a brake disc (6). The actuating unit additionally comprises a first and second reduction gears (2, 3). In order to decouple the second reduction gear (3) from the first reduction gear (2), the invention provides that the electric motor (11), the first reduction gear (2) and the second reduction gear (3) are designed as at least two components which can be handled separately.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F16D 65/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F16D 65/18 (2006.01); F16D 65/14 (2006.01); F16D 66/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F16D 65/18 (2013.01); F16D 2066/003 (2013.01); F16D 2066/005 (2013.01); F16D 2121/24 (2013.01); F16D 2125/40 (2013.01); F16D 2125/50 (2013.01); F16D 2125/587 (2013.01); F16D 2125/62 (2013.01); F16D 2127/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9945292A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9945292 A1 19990910; EP 1058795 A1 20001213; EP 1058795 B1 20030924; JP 2002506179 A 20020226; JP 4271852 B2 20090603; US 6405836 B1 20020618

INPADOC legal status

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160331

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150330

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150319

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-03-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090304

2009-11-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20090304

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080326

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-09-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040625

2004-06-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-03-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040210

2003-10-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59907116

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-10-30

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-09-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-09-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020927

2000-12-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001005

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT