Global Patent Index - EP 1058805 A1

EP 1058805 A1 2000-12-13 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DRYING A RAPIDLY CONVEYED PRODUCT TO BE DRIED, ESPECIALLY FOR DRYING PRINTING INK

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DRYING A RAPIDLY CONVEYED PRODUCT TO BE DRIED, ESPECIALLY FOR DRYING PRINTING INK

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM TROCKNEN EINES SCHNELL GEFÖRDERTEN TROCKNUNGSGUTES, INSBESONDERE ZUM DRUCKFARBENTROCKNEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR LE SECHAGE D'UN PRODUIT DEFILANT RAPIDEMENT, NOTAMMENT POUR LE SECHAGE D'ENCRE D'IMPRIMERIE

Publication

EP 1058805 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99910235 A

Priority

  • DE 19807643 A
  • EP 9901057 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19807643A1] The invention relates to a method and a device for drying a product to be dried (1, 2) which is rapidly conveyed in a direction of conveyance, especially for drying layers of printing ink on rapidly conveyed paper. According to said method a wet component, especially a solvent is separated from the product to be dried (1, 2) in a drying zone (T) by incident electromagnetic radiation. The separated wet component is evacuated from the drying zone (T) by a conveyor gas stream (D). The invention allows for the efficient and rapid drying especially of printed newsprint or thermoprinting paper at high conveyor speeds.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F26B 3/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 23/04 (2006.01); F26B 3/28 (2006.01); F26B 13/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F26B 3/283 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9942774A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19807643 A1 19990902; DE 19807643 C2 20000105; AT 239891 T 20030515; AU 2926899 A 19990906; BR 9908062 A 20001031; CA 2330636 A1 19990826; CN 1292080 A 20010418; CZ 20003007 A3 20011212; EP 1058805 A1 20001213; EP 1058805 B1 20030507; EP 1058805 B2 20060816; ES 2199562 T3 20040216; ES 2199562 T5 20070416; HU 0101524 A2 20011028; HU 0101524 A3 20020228; JP 2002504442 A 20020212; JP 4509378 B2 20100721; KR 100407504 B1 20031201; US 6401358 B1 20020611; WO 9942774 A1 19990826

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160218

2017-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160901

2017-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160229

2016-11-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20161028

2016-10-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160218

2016-09-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59905454

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150324

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150319

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150324

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-03-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120219

2013-07-08 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20130708

2012-11-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120218

2011-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20110322

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110222

- Year of fee payment: 13

2007-04-16 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T5

2007-03-16 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2007-01-24 [GBTA] GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977)

2006-08-16 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20060816

2006-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI SE

2004-10-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-03-24 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: HERAEUS NOBLELIGHT GMBH

- Effective date: 20040126

2004-03-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-02-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040229

2004-02-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040229

2004-02-18 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040218

2004-02-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2199562 T3

2003-09-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-08-07 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030807

2003-08-07 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030807

2003-06-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59905454 P 20030612

2003-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-05-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI SE

2003-05-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-05-07 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030507

2001-05-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010323

2000-12-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000822

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI SE