Global Patent Index - EP 1058807 A1

EP 1058807 A1 2000-12-13 - HEAT EXCHANGER WITH FLEXIBLE TUBES

Title (en)

HEAT EXCHANGER WITH FLEXIBLE TUBES

Title (de)

WÄRMETAUSCHER MIT BIEGSAMEN ROHREN

Title (fr)

ECHANGEUR DE CHALEUR A TUBES SOUPLES

Publication

EP 1058807 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99961164 A

Priority

  • FR 9903277 W
  • FR 9816560 A
  • FR 9906223 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2787873A1] The invention concerns a heat exchanger (2) with flexible tubes (20), particularly for a motor vehicle cooling installation. The tubes (20), for example made of a plastic material, are designed to carry a heat-exchanging fluid capable of co-operating with an air stream circulating through the exchanger (2). The inventive exchanger (2) comprises means for maintaining the tubes (20) in parallel rows. The tubes (20) are designed to be generally shaped like substantially sinusoidal lines. The sinusoids of two contacting tubes (211, 212) of two consecutive rows, are phase offset relatively to each other such that the two tubes (211, 212) are maintained in two contact zones (210) per sinusoid interval, thereby leaving interstices between the tubes (20) to enhance the penetration of the flux.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F28F 9/013; F28D 1/047; F28F 21/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F28F 1/08 (2006.01); F28D 1/047 (2006.01); F28F 9/013 (2006.01); F28F 21/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28F 21/062 (2013.01); F28D 1/0477 (2013.01); F28F 9/0137 (2013.01); F28F 2240/00 (2013.01); F28F 2275/025 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0039517A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2787873 A1 20000630; FR 2787873 B1 20010706; DE 69905862 D1 20030417; DE 69905862 T2 20031211; EP 1058807 A1 20001213; EP 1058807 B1 20030312; JP 2002533655 A 20021008; US 6390187 B1 20020521; WO 0039517 A1 20000706

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071223

2008-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080701

2006-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061231

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-12-11 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20061211

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-03-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031215

2003-10-29 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 1058807E

2003-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-09-10 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20030312

2003-04-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69905862 P 20030417

2003-04-16 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2003-03-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2003-03-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-03-12 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030312

2000-12-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000927

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE