Global Patent Index - EP 1058808 A1

EP 1058808 A1 2000-12-13 - STAB AND BULLET PROOF PROTECTIVE CLOTHING

Title (en)

STAB AND BULLET PROOF PROTECTIVE CLOTHING

Title (de)

STICH- UND KUGELSCHUTZKLEIDUNG

Title (fr)

VETEMENT DE PROTECTION CONTRE LES BALLES ET CONTRE LES COUPS PROVOQUES PAR UN OBJET TRANCHANT OU PIQUANT

Publication

EP 1058808 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99902548 A

Priority

  • DE 19802242 A
  • EP 9900258 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19802242A1] Protective clothing for protection against stab wounds is comprised of more than one layer of a flat object which is coated with hard materials. The hard materials are deposited according to technology relating to abrasives. The protective clothing offers an equally good protection against knife-like and needle-like stabbing objects. A packet comprised of 2 - 20 layers of a flat object coated with hard materials is combined with a packet comprised of 6 - 50 layers of a non-coated aramid fabric in order to produce protective clothing which should protect against stab and bullet wounds.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F41H 1/02; B32B 7/02; B32B 27/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41H 1/02 (2006.01); A41D 31/00 (2006.01); A43B 7/32 (2006.01); A43B 13/12 (2006.01); A43B 17/04 (2006.01); B32B 7/02 (2006.01); B32B 27/10 (2006.01); F41H 5/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A43B 13/10 (2013.01); A41D 31/0061 (2013.01); A43B 7/32 (2013.01); A43B 13/12 (2013.01); A43B 17/04 (2013.01); F41H 5/0435 (2013.01); Y10S 428/911 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24471 (2013.01); Y10T 442/2615 (2015.04); Y10T 442/2623 (2015.04); Y10T 442/2861 (2015.04); Y10T 442/2902 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9937969A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19802242 A1 19990805; DE 19802242 C2 19991111; AT 229636 T 20021215; AU 2279999 A 19990809; AU 743770 B2 20020207; BR 9907152 A 20001024; CA 2319165 A1 19990729; CA 2319165 C 20070320; CN 1093629 C 20021030; CN 1288513 A 20010321; CO 4780058 A1 19990526; CZ 20002695 A3 20010516; CZ 292963 B6 20040114; DK 1058808 T3 20030331; EE 04601 B1 20060215; EE 200000439 A 20010815; EP 1058808 A1 20001213; EP 1058808 B1 20021211; ES 2184409 T3 20030401; HR P20000455 A2 20010831; HR P20000455 B1 20031231; HU 0102551 A2 20011128; HU 0102551 A3 20030128; HU 227648 B1 20111028; ID 26013 A 20001116; IL 137163 A 20030529; IL 137163 D0 20010724; JP 2002501166 A 20020115; JP 4176959 B2 20081105; NO 20003697 A 20000920; NO 20003697 D0 20000719; NO 318076 B1 20050131; PL 188950 B1 20050531; PL 341858 A1 20010507; RU 2206858 C2 20030620; SK 10962000 A3 20010212; SK 284907 B6 20060202; TR 200002116 T2 20001023; US 6656570 B1 20031202; WO 9937969 A1 19990729; YU 46400 A 20021018; YU 49214 B 20040903; ZA 9900408 B 19990720

INPADOC legal status


2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160127

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160129

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160201

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140119

2015-03-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20150327

2014-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140131

2014-10-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140801

2014-10-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140118

2014-10-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20140930

2014-08-25 [REG LT MM9D] CANCELLATION OF EXTENSION OF EUROPEAN PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM9D

- Effective date: 20140118

2014-08-20 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20140801

2014-01-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130118

2014-01-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130131

2013-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130131

2013-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130119

2013-10-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130131

2013-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130131

2013-10-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130131

2013-10-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130802

2013-10-23 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

2013-10-01 [REG GR ML] LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: ML

- Ref Document Number: 20030400953

- Country of Ref Document: GR

- Effective date: 20130802

2013-09-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM01

- Ref Document Number: 229636

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20130131

2013-09-03 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2013-08-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2013-08-26 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

2013-07-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *TEIJIN TWARON G.M.B.H.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20130131

2013-05-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130121

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-04-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130129

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130111

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130220

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120123

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-06-29 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120130

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-06-29 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120123

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-06-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120125

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-06-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120126

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120126

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-04-30 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120121

- Year of fee payment: 14

2003-12-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030912

2003-08-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-04-24 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

- Ref Document Number: 20030400953

- Country of Ref Document: GR

2003-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2184409

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-03-31 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2003-01-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59903739

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-01-23

2003-01-22 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2002-12-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20021211

2002-12-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL SE

2002-12-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: LT PAYMENT 20000706

2002-12-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-12-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 229636

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-12-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2002-07-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TEIJIN TWARON GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-06-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020418

2001-04-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TWARON PRODUCTS GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-12-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000706

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL SE

2000-12-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: LT PAYMENT 20000706