Global Patent Index - EP 1058925 A1

EP 1058925 A1 2000-12-13 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR NOISE-COMPENSATED SPEECH RECOGNITION

Title (en)

SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR NOISE-COMPENSATED SPEECH RECOGNITION

Title (de)

SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR GERÄUSCHKOMPENSIERTEN SPRACHERKENNUNG

Title (fr)

SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE RECONNAISSANCE VOCALE A COMPENSATION DE BRUIT

Publication

EP 1058925 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99905664 A

Priority

  • US 9902280 W
  • US 1825798 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9940571A1] A system and method for improving speech recognition accuracy in the presence of noise is provided. The speech recognition training unit is modified to store digitized speech samples into a speech database that can be accessed at recognition time. The improved recognition unit comprises a noise analysis, modelling, and synthesis unit which continually analyzes the noise characteristics present in the audio environment and produces an estimated noise signal with similar characteristics. The recognition unit then constructs a noise-compensated template database by adding the estimated noise signal to each of the speech samples in the speech database and performing parameter determination on the resulting sums. This procedure accounts for the presence of noise in the recognition phase by retraining all the templates using an estimated noise signal with similar characteristics as the actual noise signal that corrupted the word to be recognized. This method improves the likelihood of a good template match, which increases the recognition accuracy.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G10L 5/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G10L 15/02 (2006.01); G10L 15/10 (2006.01); G10L 15/20 (2006.01); G10L 21/0216 (2013.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G10L 15/20 (2013.01); G10L 21/0216 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9940571A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR

EPO simple patent family

WO 9940571 A1 19990812; AU 2577499 A 19990823; CN 1228761 C 20051123; CN 1296607 A 20010523; DE 69916255 D1 20040513; DE 69916255 T2 20050414; EP 1058925 A1 20001213; EP 1058925 B1 20040407; HK 1035600 A1 20060721; JP 2002502993 A 20020129; JP 4750271 B2 20110817; US 2001001141 A1 20010510; US 6381569 B1 20020430

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170227

- Year of fee payment: 19

2012-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110228

2011-11-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20111102

2010-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100222

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-03-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050110

2004-12-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-05-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69916255 P 20040513

2004-04-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2003-08-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 10L 15/20 A

2003-08-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 10L 15/06 B

2002-12-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021025

2000-12-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SIH, GILBERT, C.

2000-12-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BI, NING C/O QUALCOMM INCORPORATED

2000-12-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000728

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR