Global Patent Index - EP 1058932 A1

EP 1058932 A1 2000-12-13 - X-RAY EXAMINATION APPARATUS

Title (en)

X-RAY EXAMINATION APPARATUS

Title (de)

RÖNTGENSTRAHLUNGEN-PRÜFUNGSVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

APPAREIL POUR EXAMEN AUX RAYONS

Publication

EP 1058932 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99963501 A

Priority

  • EP 99963501 A
  • EP 9909820 W
  • EP 98204385 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0038198A1] The invention relates to an X-ray apparatus which includes an adjustable X-ray filter. In order to adjust an intensity profile of the X-ray beam, an X-ray absorbing liquid is transported to filter elements of the X-ray filter. Such transport is susceptible to gravitational forces which lead to an irregular hydrostatic pressure distribution in the X-ray filter. In order to reduce the effects of the gravitational forces on the transport of the X-ray absorbing liquid, the duct connecting the filter elements to the reservoir is subdivided into sub-ducts and the reservoir is subdivided into chambers, each chamber being connected to at least one sub-duct. The X-ray apparatus also includes means for keeping the sub-ducts aligned with a horizontal plane.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G21K 1/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G21K 3/00 (2006.01); A61B 6/00 (2006.01); G21K 1/10 (2006.01); G21K 5/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G21K 1/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0038198A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 0038198 A1 20000629; EP 1058932 A1 20001213; JP 2002533147 A 20021008; US 6275568 B1 20010814

INPADOC legal status


2004-06-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031125

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2003-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021119

2001-03-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001229

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE