Global Patent Index - EP 1058938 A1

EP 1058938 A1 2000-12-13 - DEVICE FOR SWITCHING AN ELECTRICAL CONNECTION, ESPECIALLY A LIMIT SWITCH

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR SWITCHING AN ELECTRICAL CONNECTION, ESPECIALLY A LIMIT SWITCH

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM SCHALTEN EINER ELEKTRISCHEN VERBINDUNG, INSBESONDERE GRENZTASTER

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR COMMUTER UNE LIAISON ELECTRIQUE, NOTAMMENT INTERRUPTEUR-LIMITEUR

Publication

EP 1058938 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99907536 A

Priority

  • DE 19808060 A
  • EP 9900887 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19808060A1] The invention relates to a device for switching an electrical connection, especially a limit switch, comprising a plunger means (101, 106) which can be actuated from outside the device and is axially coupled to an actuator (110) which is not accessible from outside the device and designed for an electrical switch element (119). According to the invention a first energy store, especially a first coil spring (116) subjected to a compressive stress, pretenses the actuator (110) in the direction of the plunger means (101, 106). The aim of the invention is to provide a device which while having especially axially reduced dimensions offers perfectly reliable switching performance during switching, even at elevated acceleration forces, as well as mechanical stability, in particular mechanical overload protection for the switching element. To this end the first energy store at least partly surrounds the switching element (119).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 13/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 13/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 13/18 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9944211A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19808060 A1 19990909; AT 218007 T 20020615; EP 1058938 A1 20001213; EP 1058938 B1 20020522; WO 9944211 A1 19990902

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160901

2016-09-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59901498

2015-07-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59901498

- Representative's name: RUCKH, RAINER, DIPL.-PHYS. DR.RER.NAT., DE

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150212

- Year of fee payment: 17

2010-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100211

2010-10-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100228

2010-10-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100228

2010-09-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-06-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20090218

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-04-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20090114

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-09-28 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG;POSTFACH 1772;8027 ZUERICH (CH)

2003-05-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030225

2002-06-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59901498 20020627

2002-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-05-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2002-05-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 218007 T 20020615

2001-10-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010919

2000-12-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000217

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI