Global Patent Index - EP 1058953 A1

EP 1058953 A1 2000-12-13 - SEAL TESTABLE ELECTRIC CONTACT ARRAY

Title (en)

SEAL TESTABLE ELECTRIC CONTACT ARRAY

Title (de)

DICHTPRÜFBARE ELEKTRISCHE KONTAKTANORDNUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE CONTACTS ELECTRIQUES A ETANCHEITE CONTROLEE

Publication

EP 1058953 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99964359 A

Priority

  • DE 9903710 W
  • DE 29823046 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6599144B1] The invention relates to an electric contact array having two contacts between which an electrically conductive connection exists, wherein the contact array is watertight and dust-tight, wherein the contacts are disposed in a sealed area. According to the invention, two sealing elements are disposed at a distance from one another in order to seal the sealed area. A test area is provided between the sealing elements, said test area having a hole that enables access from the outside.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01M 3/26 (2006.01); H01R 13/52 (2006.01); H01R 13/533 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/5219 (2013.01); G01M 3/26 (2013.01); H01R 2101/00 (2013.01); Y10S 439/912 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0039898A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29823046 U1 19990422; BR 9908162 A 20001031; EP 1058953 A1 20001213; US 6599144 B1 20030729; WO 0039898 A1 20000706

INPADOC legal status


2008-07-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080110

2007-10-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070829

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE

2002-12-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HENGST GMBH & CO. KG

2000-12-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000817

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE