Global Patent Index - EP 1059051 A1

EP 1059051 A1 2000-12-13 - Adjustable arm-rest for a chair

Title (en)

Adjustable arm-rest for a chair

Title (de)

Verstellbare Armlehne für einen Stuhl

Title (fr)

Accoudoir réglable pour une chaise

Publication

EP 1059051 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00810488 A

Priority

DE 29910250 U

Abstract (en)

An arm-rest support (1) is fixed to the chair, with a strut (2) supported by the support and has a horizontally adjustable arm-rest. The arm-rest is also height adjustable by a strut that has a top fixed support plate (20) with upper-side locking contour (21). The bottom of the arm rest has a base plate (30) with underside possessing a counterpart contour (33) cooperating with the locking contour. The arm rest with base plate is swivel mounted on the support plate on a vertical axis (D).

Abstract (de)

Die verstellbare Armlehne für einen Stuhl hat eine in horizontaler Ausrichtung einstellbare Armauflage. Vorzugsweise ist die von einem Lehnensupport (1) gestützte Armlehne auch höhenverstellbar. Der Lehnensupport (1) trägt eine Lehnenstütze (2), auf der die Armauflage angeordnet ist. Die Lehnenstütze (2) weist oben eine feststehende Trägerplatte (20) mit einer auf deren Oberseite vorgesehener Arretierkontur (21) auf. Unten hat die Armauflage eine Basisplatte (30), an deren Unterseite eine mit der Arretierkontur (21) zusammen wirkende Gegenkontur vorhanden ist. Die Armauflage ist mit Ihrer Basisplatte (30) auf die Trägerplatte (20), um eine vertikale Drehachse (D) schwenkbar, aufgesetzt. Zum horizontalen Verschwenken der Armauflage lässt sich diese mit Kraftaufwand elastisch nach oben soweit ausheben, dass die Arretierkontur (21) und die Gegenkontur ausser Eingriff kommen. Auch beim abstützenden Aufstehen des Benutzer vom Stuhl, mit entsprechender Krafteinwirkung auf die Armauflage, wird deren unbeabsichtigtes horizontales Verstellen ausgeschlossen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 1/03

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 1/03 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 1/03 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29910250 U1 19991104; EP 1059051 A1 20001213

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030704

2003-04-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030221

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010605

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI