Global Patent Index - EP 1059052 A2

EP 1059052 A2 2000-12-13 - Refrigerated display case

Title (en)

Refrigerated display case

Title (de)

Warenkühltheke

Title (fr)

Comptoir réfrigéré

Publication

EP 1059052 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00112176 A

Priority

DE 19925734 A

Abstract (en)

Counter has circulation air cooling for goods on goods surface with cooled circulating air flow from air outlet at end of goods surface towards goods. Goods supporting surface (10) has separate upper and lower parts (10a,10b) forming intermediate chamber (42) communicating with air outlet. Removable air guide (40) is fitted near air outlet (28) to deflect some of air flow into chamber (42).

Abstract (de)

Bei einer Warenkühltheke mit einer Umluftkühlung strömt ein Teil (26a) des gekühlten Umluftstroms aus einer an einem stirnseitigen Rand des Warenbodens (10) angeordneten Luftaustrittsöffnung (28) in Richtung zur Ware (6) hin aus. Der Warenboden (10) umfasst ein unteres Bodenteil (10a) und ein oberes Bodenteil (10b), das derart beabstandet auf dem unteren Bodenteil (10a) angeordnet ist, dass sich zwischen dem oberen Bodenteil (10b) und dem unteren Bodenteil (10a) ein mit der Luftaustrittsöffnung (28) kommunizierender Zwischenraum (42) ergibt, in den durch eine im Bereich der Luftaustrittsöffnung (28) angeordnete, abnehmbare Leiteinrichtung (40) ein Teil (26b) des gekühlten Umluftstroms abgezweigt wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47F 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47F 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47F 3/0456 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1059052 A2 20001213; EP 1059052 A3 20010822

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-01 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040204

2003-11-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030923

2002-05-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT NL

2002-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020222

2001-08-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI