Global Patent Index - EP 1059053 A1

EP 1059053 A1 2000-12-13 - Display device for table tennis tables

Title (en)

Display device for table tennis tables

Title (de)

Präsentationsvorrichtung für Tischtennistische

Title (fr)

Présentoir de tables de tennis de table

Publication

EP 1059053 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00401603 A

Priority

FR 9907409 A

Abstract (en)

Display shelf comprises central support structure (1) with crosspieces (4) and bases (5). Two boards (10,11) are connected to support structure by articulated arms (16). End base of each board comprises legs (12,13,14,15) articulated under boards and display arms (17,18,19) articulated between legs, plates and support structure. Length of crosspieces and plate dimensions are less than smallest corresponding size of regulation table. Central support has side uprights (2,3) fitted with support (20) for net (22).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47F 7/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47F 7/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47F 7/30 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1059053 A1 20001213; FR 2794630 A1 20001215; FR 2794630 B1 20010803

INPADOC legal status


2004-02-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030812

2003-05-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030331

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-07-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010504

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI