Global patent index - EP 1059054 A1

EP 1059054 A1 2000-12-13 - Container

Title (en)

Container

Title (de)

Behälter

Title (fr)

Recipient

Publication

EP 1059054 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00112226 A

Priority

DE 19926477 A

Abstract (en)

Both the plate (1) and the lid (3) which is to be connected therewith have carrying handles (20, 11) so that each can be handled individually. The handles are integrated in the contour of the plate and in that of the lid to produce flat standing surfaces. The plate can have a socket (15) to hold a temperature control element.

Abstract (de)

Behälter zur Aufnahme von Lebensmitteln, bestehend aus einer Platte 1 und einer mit dieser kraftschlüssig zu verbindenden Haube 3, wobei zur wechselseitigen Nutzung sowohl auf der Seite der Platte 1 als auch der Seite der Haube 3 ein Traggriff 20, vorgesehen ist, wobei die Traggriffe 20, 11 zur Erzielung einer planen Aufstandsfläche 21 in die Kontur der Platte 1 und in die der Haube 3 integriert sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47G 19/26; B65D 51/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47G 19/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 25/2882 (2013.01); A47G 19/26 (2013.01); Y10S 220/912 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1059054 A1 20001213; DE 19926477 A1 20001214; DE 19926477 B4 20090423; US 6581795 B1 20030624

INPADOC legal status

2005-06-01 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20041123

2003-07-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030514

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010112

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI