Global Patent Index - EP 1059060 A2

EP 1059060 A2 2000-12-13 - Footwear wiper

Title (en)

Footwear wiper

Title (de)

Schuhabstreifer

Title (fr)

Paillasson

Publication

EP 1059060 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00304831 A

Priority

LK 1173599 A

Abstract (en)

A footwear wiper (20) comprises an outer metal wire frame (22), a series of rubber or plastics separators (10) each extending between two opposite parallel sides of the outer frame (20), a series of twisted-in fibre rods (30), each extending parallel to the two sides of the frame through holes (14) in the separators (10) and further twisted-in fibre rods (32A, 32B, 32C) raised from the level of the base mat. This allows both the sides and bottom of the footwear to be cleaned efficiently. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 23/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 23/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 23/24 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB LU NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1059060 A2 20001213; EP 1059060 A3 20020911

INPADOC legal status


2003-06-25 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030502

2003-05-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB LU NL

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-09-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 47L 23/24 A, 7A 47L 23/26 B

2001-08-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010607

2001-06-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MENDIS, HILARIAN CHRISHAN SALINDA

2001-04-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MENDIS, HILARIAN CHRISHAN SALINDA

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI