Global Patent Index - EP 1059103 A1

EP 1059103 A1 2000-12-13 - Modular playfield with inflated obstacles

Title (en)

Modular playfield with inflated obstacles

Title (de)

Modulares Spielfeld mit aufgeblasenen Hindernissen

Title (fr)

Terrain de jeu modulable à obstacles ventilés

Publication

EP 1059103 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00401624 A

Priority

FR 9907184 A

Abstract (en)

The playing field comprises big (3,4), little cylindrical tubular casings (5) and extensions (6,7,8) attached together by connection parts (9,10,11) to form continuous internal volume filled with air at specified pressure of 1.5 bars. It has corner fan (2) compensating for pressure losses in internal volume. Various shaped obstacles (12,13,14,15) are arranged either horizontally or vertically.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63C 19/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63C 19/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63C 19/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1059103 A1 20001213; FR 2794661 A1 20001215; FR 2794661 B1 20020726; US 6296580 B1 20011002

INPADOC legal status


2004-06-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031202

2003-07-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030519

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010611

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI