Global Patent Index - EP 1059124 A2

EP 1059124 A2 2000-12-13 - Disc screen

Title (en)

Disc screen

Title (de)

Rotorsieb

Title (fr)

Tamis à disques

Publication

EP 1059124 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00111126 A

Priority

DE 19925517 A

Abstract (en)

The plate screen has several parallel driven shafts carrying meshing plates. Each shaft (12) has a raised element e.g. a strut (8) extending over the full length of its outer surface and parallel to the longitudinal shaft axis. Each shaft also has several parallel recesses. The shafts are supported in a frame (13) via side holders, and the struts are located between the holders. The screen plates (7) have cut-outs corresponding to the profiles of struts and shafts.

Abstract (de)

Rotorsieb, insbesondere Scheibensieb oder Scheibenseparator, welches mehrere parallel in einem Gestell angeordnete und antreibbare Wellen (12) aufweist, auf denen mehrere Scheiben (7) auf Lücke und ineinandergreifend angeordnet sind. Um ein Rotorsieb zu schaffen, welches in der Lage ist, Kleinteile aus Altpapierchargen unterschiedlicher Fraktion abzusieben, ohne daß diese Kleinteile von Hand in mühsamer Weise entfernt werden müssen, ist vorgesehen, daß die Wellen (12) auf ihren Außenflächen jeweils zumindest ein sich in Längsrichtung erstreckendes, eine Vertiefung (16) oder Erhöhung (8) bildendes Element aufweisen. Auf den Außenflächen der Wellen sind jeweils mehrere sich, vorzugsweise zumindest annähernd parallel zur Wellenachse erstreckende Streben (8) angeordnet. Die Wellen weisen einen rechteckigen, vorzugsweise einen quadratischen Querschnitt auf und in dem Bereich der Kanten der Wellen sind die Streben (8) angeordnet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B07B 1/15

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B07B 1/15 (2006.01); B07B 1/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B07B 1/4609 (2013.01); B07B 1/15 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19925517 A1 20001207; EP 1059124 A2 20001213; EP 1059124 A3 20010314; JP 2001017920 A 20010123

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030524

2003-02-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030113

2001-12-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010801

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI