Global Patent Index - EP 1059125 A2

EP 1059125 A2 2000-12-13 - Method for the manufacture of metal strip

Title (en)

Method for the manufacture of metal strip

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Herstellen von Metallband

Title (fr)

Procédé pour la fabrication de bandes métalliques

Publication

EP 1059125 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00112295 A

Priority

  • DE 19925942 A
  • DE 10025080 A

Abstract (en)

Production of thin metal strips of at least 0.6 mm thickness, a maximum width of 1800 mm and an average width of 1300 mm comprises casting a strand (9) in a single strand casting device (1) at a speed of not more than 8 m/min and a solidification thickness of 100-200 mm; and passing the strand through the mill train (2) connected to the single strand casting device. The strand is passed through the mill train (2) connected to the single strand casting device with an inlet speed of not less than 0.15 m/s and an outlet speed of not more than 16 m/s. An Independent claim is also included for a device for carrying out the metal strip production.

Abstract (de)

Zur Herstellung von dünnem Metallband mit einer Dicke von mindestens 0,6 mm mit einer maximalen Breite von 1800 mm bei einer mittleren Breite von 1.300 mm, welches stranggegossen und gewalzt wird, werden folgende Prozeßparameter für eine Produktion von 2-3 Millionen Tonnen Warmband (5) pro Jahr in einer Endlosgießwalzanlage vorgeschlagen: Einstranggießmaschine mit einer Gießgeschwindigkeit von <= 8 m/ min und einer Erstarrungsdicke von >= 100 mm und <= 200mm, Durchlaufen dieses Strangs über einen direkten Endlos-Verbund der der Einstranggießmaschine nachgeordneten Walzstraße (2) mit einer Fertigwalzstraße (4) und ggf. Vorwalzstraße (3) mit einer Einzugswalzgeschwindigkeit des Bandes (5a) in die Fertigwalzstraße von >= 0,15 m/s und einer Auslaufgeschwindigkeit im letzten Gerüst der Fertigstraße von <= 16m/s. Zudem wird eine entsprechende Anlage vorgeschlagen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21B 1/46; B22D 11/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21B 1/46 (2006.01); B22D 11/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/14 (2013.01); B21B 1/46 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1059125 A2 20001213; EP 1059125 A3 20030115

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030716

2003-11-06 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-10-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-01-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-01-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000616

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI