Global Patent Index - EP 1059126 A2

EP 1059126 A2 2000-12-13 - Method for controlling the tension between the rolling stands of rolling trains for steel bars, wires or profiles

Title (en)

Method for controlling the tension between the rolling stands of rolling trains for steel bars, wires or profiles

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Zugregelung zwischen den Walzgerüsten von Walzenstrassen für Stabstahl, Draht oder Profile

Title (fr)

Procédé pour régler la tension entre les cages de laminoir de trains de laminoirs pour acier en barres, fils ou profilés

Publication

EP 1059126 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00112294 A

Priority

  • DE 19926230 A
  • DE 10007364 A

Abstract (en)

Regulating pull between roll stands of roll trains comprises quantitatively acquiring a fluctuation amplitude and fluctuation frequency during rolling rods or wires from the fluctuations that the rod or wire produce between two subsequent roll stands, and determining a pull and/or the pressure prevailing in the rolling stock between the roll stands by comparing with identification points.

Abstract (de)

Ein Walzgut (1) wird in einer Transportrichtung (x) von einem vorderen zu einem hinteren Walzgerüst (2, 3) transportiert. Das Walzgut (1) führt dabei zwischen den Walzgerüsten (2, 3) eine Schwingung quer zur Transportrichtung (x) aus. Mindestens eine charakteristische Eigenschaft (A, f) der Schwingung wird quantitativ erfaßt und daraus ein im Walzgut (1) zwischen den Walzgerüsten (2, 3) herrschender Zug (Z) bzw. Druck ermittelt. Eines der Walzgerüste (2, 3) wird derart nachgeregelt, daß sich im Walzgut (1) zwischen den Walzgerüsten (2, 3) ein Sollzug (Z*) aufbaut. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21B 37/52

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21B 37/52 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21B 37/52 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1059126 A2 20001213; EP 1059126 A3 20031126; BR 0002596 A 20010313; DE 10007364 A1 20010301; US 6349581 B1 20020226

INPADOC legal status


2005-07-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041214

2004-09-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040802

2004-08-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-11-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-11-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-12-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000703

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI