Global Patent Index - EP 1059132 A1

EP 1059132 A1 2000-12-13 - Method for continuous casting of steel

Title (en)

Method for continuous casting of steel

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Stranggiessen von Stahl

Title (fr)

Procédé de coulée d'acier en continue

Publication

EP 1059132 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00106832 A

Priority

JP 16608299 A

Abstract (en)

A method of continuous casting of a steel employs a mold power having a viscosity of 0.5-1.5 poise at 1,300 DEG C and a solidification temperature of 1,190-1,270 DEG C, in which the mass ratio of CaO to SiO2 is 1.2-1.9, and casting is carried out under the following conditions: casting speed is 2.5-10 m/minute; mold oscillation stroke is 4-15 mm; and specific cooling intensity in secondary cooling of a slab is 1.0-5.0 liter/kg-steel. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 11/10; B22D 11/128; B22D 11/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/10 (2006.01); B22D 11/051 (2006.01); B22D 11/108 (2006.01); B22D 11/111 (2006.01); B22D 11/124 (2006.01); B22D 11/128 (2006.01); B22D 11/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/111 (2013.01); B22D 11/128 (2013.01); B22D 11/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [DA] DATABASE WPI Section Ch Week 199140, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class M22, AN 1991-291460, XP002146863
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1998, no. 14 31 December 1998 (1998-12-31)
  • [A] DATABASE WPI Section Ch Week 198634, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class M22, AN 1986-221131, XP002146864
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1999, no. 10 31 August 1999 (1999-08-31)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1059132 A1 20001213; EP 1059132 B1 20021009; DE 60000555 D1 20021114; DE 60000555 T2 20030313; JP 2000351049 A 20001219; JP 3019859 B1 20000313; US 6386271 B1 20020514

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170321

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-01-02 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORPORATION, JP

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SUMITOMO METAL INDUSTRIES, LTD., OSAKA, JP

- Document: DE 60000555

- Effective date: 20131111

2014-01-02 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60000555

- Representative's name: KUHNEN & WACKER PATENT- UND RECHTSANWALTSBUERO, DE

- Effective date: 20131111

2013-11-11 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60000555

- Representative's name: KUHNEN & WACKER PATENT- UND RECHTSANWALTSBUERO, DE

2006-12-13 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20061109

2003-09-03 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: SMS DEMAG AG

- Effective date: 20030703

2002-11-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60000555 20021114

2002-10-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE

2002-04-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020315

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE

2001-03-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010115

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE

2000-12-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI