Global patent index - EP 1059150 A1

EP 1059150 A1 2000-12-13 - Safety razor

Title (en)

Safety razor

Title (de)

Sicherheitsrasierer

Title (fr)

Rasoir de sécurité

Publication

EP 1059150 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99111134 A

Priority

EP 99111134 A

Abstract (en)

A safety razor with a plurality of blade members (1,2,3) which are covered by a guard plate (6). The guard plate is provided with a plurality of blade tip guards (8) which are arranged along the blade tip edges of the blade members, and the blade tip edge of at least one of the plurality of blade members is not in contact with the blade tip guards of the guard plate and exposed between the blade tip guards. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B26B 21/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26B 21/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26B 21/4006 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1059150 A1 20001213; EP 1059150 B1 20021127; DE 69904153 D1 20030109; DE 69904153 T2 20030612

INPADOC legal status

2015-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150623

- Year of fee payment: 17

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100101

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-03-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20100226

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080618

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080630

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-11-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030828

2003-04-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-02-27 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030227

2003-02-27 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030227

2003-01-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69904153

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-01-09

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR GB SE

2002-11-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2002-04-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020228

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE DK FR GB SE

2000-12-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990609

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR GB SE

2000-12-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI