Global Patent Index - EP 1059165 A2

EP 1059165 A2 2000-12-13 - Chain guide track for a chain drive with roller chains

Title (en)

Chain guide track for a chain drive with roller chains

Title (de)

Kettenführungsbahn für einen Kettentrieb mit Rollenketten

Title (fr)

Guide pour chaîne dans une transmission par chaîne avec des chaînes à rouleaux

Publication

EP 1059165 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00110877 A

Priority

DE 29909552 U

Abstract (en)

A printing machine is powered by an endless chain running through a two-sided guide groove formed by a series of rail guide sections (9) fitted end-to-end and meeting at an interface (10). The interface is formed by an L-shaped butt joint, each half having an elongated section (16). The elongated section is inclined (7, 8) slightly downwards with respect to the main plane of motion (14).

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Kettenführungsbahn für einen Kettentrieb mit Rollenketten, vorzugsweise in einer Druckmaschine. Aufgabe der Erfindung ist es eine Lösung zu schaffen, die inbesondere an den Übergängen auftretende Schwingungen der Rollenkette dämpft und den Montageaufwand reduziert. Gelöst wird das dadurch, indem im Bereich der durch Bauteile 9 in Stoß-an-Stoß-Montage gebildeten Übergänge 10 die Endbereiche der Laufbahn der Bauteile 9 unterhalb des Niveaus der Laufbahn gegenläufig auslaufend angeordnet sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 13/03; B41F 21/00; B65G 21/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 29/04 (2006.01); F16H 7/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 29/041 (2013.01); F16H 7/18 (2013.01); B65H 2404/342 (2013.01); B65H 2801/21 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 29909552 U1 19990812; AT 249926 T 20031015; EP 1059165 A2 20001213; EP 1059165 A3 20020925; EP 1059165 B1 20030917; JP 3073755 U 20001208

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121201

2013-03-21 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50003696

- Effective date: 20121201

2012-06-28 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: MANROLAND SHEETFED GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: MANROLAND AG, 63075 OFFENBACH, DE

- Document: DE 50003696

- Effective date: 20120509

2011-09-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110520

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-01-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090523

2008-08-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20080515

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-10-01 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-09-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040618

2004-04-21 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-03-17 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20030917

2003-10-29 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-10-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50003696 P 20031023

2003-09-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB

2003-09-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-09-17 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030917

2003-09-17 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030917

2003-06-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB

2002-10-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020816

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI