Global Patent Index - EP 1059197 A1

EP 1059197 A1 2000-12-13 - Beam for force supporting in a vehicle

Title (en)

Beam for force supporting in a vehicle

Title (de)

Holmelement zur Kraftabstützung in einem Fahrzeug

Title (fr)

Barre supportant des efforts dans un véhicule

Publication

EP 1059197 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00111846 A

Priority

DE 29910063 U

Abstract (en)

Capping element (1) has a profile element (2) made of an open hollow profile so that its pushing middle point, based on a cross-section plane running through an application of force (4), is displaced opposite its center of gravity. The application of force is displaced opposite the pushing middle point. Torsion of the profile element occurs about a longitudinal axis when force is applied until the force axis runs through the pushing middle point.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Holmelement (1) zur Abstützung einer Kraft (F) in einem Fahrzeug, insbesondere zur Abstützung eines oberen, im Bereich einer Rückenlehne integrierten Gurtpunktes bei einem Gurtintegralsitz, bestehend aus einem Profilelement (2) mit einem starr zu befestigenden ersten Profilende (2a) und einem freien zweiten Profilende (2b), wobei am zweiten Profilende (2b) ein Kraftangriff (4) für die in Richtung einer zur Profil-Längsachse (6) etwa senkrecht verlaufenden Kraftachse (K) wirkende Kraft (F) angeordnet ist. Das Profilelement (2) ist von einem offenen Hohlprofil gebildet, so daß - bezogen auf eine durch den Kraftangriff (4) verlaufende Querschnittsebene - sein Schubmittelpunkt (T) gegenüber seinem Schwerpunkt (S) versetzt ist, wobei der Kraftangriff (4) gegenüber dem Schubmittelpunkt (T) derart versetzt angeordnet ist, daß bei Beaufschlagung mit einer Kraft (F) bis zu einem bestimmten Kraftbetrag eine Torsion des Profilelementes (2) um eine Längsachse soweit erfolgt, bis die Kraftachse (K) durch den Schubmittelpunkt (T) verläuft. <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B60N 2/68

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60N 2/68 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B60N 2/68 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 29910063 U1 20001012; EP 1059197 A1 20001213; EP 1059197 B1 20030827

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070607

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060630

2007-04-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070228

2007-02-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060607

2007-01-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070103

2006-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060630

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-06-07 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060607

2005-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050630

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-05-16 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050516

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-05-12 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050512

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-08-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040528

2004-06-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-12-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031118

2003-10-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50003416 P 20031002

2003-08-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-08-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-08-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020701

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2001-07-04 [GBC] GB: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED (GB SECTION 78(7)/1977)

2001-05-11 [EL] FR: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED

2000-12-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001023

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-12-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI