Global Patent Index - EP 1059229 A2

EP 1059229 A2 2000-12-13 - Arrangement for sailing

Title (en)

Arrangement for sailing

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Segeln

Title (fr)

Arrangement pour la navigation à voile

Publication

EP 1059229 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00109858 A

Priority

DE 19926426 A

Abstract (en)

The sailing boat with a hull (1) has at least one mast (2) to support a sail (3). The foot (6) of the mast (2) is aft of the center of gravity at the hull (1). The mast (2) is angled towards the bow, from the foot (6) to the tip (10), so that the tip (10) of the mast (2) lies over of the center of gravity to support the sail (3). The mast (2) supports at least two foresails (3), secured at the bow (9), in succession along the hull axis (14).

Abstract (de)

Die Vorrichtung zum Segeln weist einen Bootsrumpf (1), mindestens einen vom Bootsrumpf gehalterten Mast (2) sowie mindestens ein vom Mast getragenes Segel (3) auf. Ein dem Bootsrumpf zugewandter Mastfuß (6) ist entgegen einer vorgesehenen Bewegungsrichtung hinter einem Bootsschwerpunkt angeordnet. Der Mast (2) ist ausgehend vom Mastfuß in Bewegungsrichtung geneigt angeordnet. Ein am Mast (2) vorgesehener oberer Befestigungsbereich (10) für das Segel ist im wesentlichen oberhalb des Bootsschwerpunktes lokalisiert. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B63H 9/06; B63B 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B63B 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B63B 15/0083 (2013.01); B63B 2015/0025 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1059229 A2 20001213; EP 1059229 A3 20011031; DE 19926426 A1 20001221; DE 19926426 C2 20020502

INPADOC legal status


2004-06-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031202

2002-07-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-06-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020404

2002-03-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ERLER, MARTINA

2002-03-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ERLER, MARTINA

2001-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI