Global Patent Index - EP 1059242 A1

EP 1059242 A1 2000-12-13 - Blade guard

Title (en)

Blade guard

Title (de)

Klingenschutz

Title (fr)

Dispositif de protection pour une lame

Publication

EP 1059242 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00112066 A

Priority

DE 29909910 U

Abstract (en)

A blade cover consists of two congruent faces stuck together around the interposed blade. Preferred Features: The adhesive coated face may consist of an adhesive foil.

Abstract (de)

Der vorliegenden Erfindung liegt die Aufgabe zugrunde, einen Klingenschutz (1) bereitzustellen, welcher mit geringem Aufwand an Material und mit geringem Fertigungsaufwand erstellbar ist, welcher unverlierbar ist, einen wirksamen Schutz sowohl für die Klinge als auch für Personen darstellt, gleichzeitig als Informationsträger in Form eines Etiketts verwendbar ist und darüber hinaus eine weitestgehende Betrachtung und Prüfung des Produktes zuläßt. Zur technischen Lösung der Aufgabe wird mit der Erfindung vorgeschlagen ein Klingenschutz für eine Klinge (2) eines Messers, einer Schere oder dergleichen während eines Transportes, Anbietens, Ausstellens, Vertriebes und dergleichen, bestehend aus zwei im wesentlichen konkruenten Teilflächen(3,4), von denen wenigstens eine an einer Oberfläche im wesentlichen vollflächig mit einem Klebstoff versehen ist und welche die Klinge (2) zwischen sich aufnehmend miteinander verklebt sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 73/00; B26B 29/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26B 29/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26B 29/025 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES GB IT LI PT

EPO simple patent family

DE 29909910 U1 19990909; EP 1059242 A1 20001213; EP 1059242 B1 20030910; ES 2206106 T3 20040516; PT 1059242 E 20040227

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160628

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160830

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160603

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160614

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160620

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 17

2007-10-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: VICTORINOX AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2004-09-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040614

2004-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2206106

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-11-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20031105

2003-10-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50003607

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-10-16

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-09-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-09-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2003-09-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES GB IT LI PT

2003-09-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-02-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020103

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE ES GB IT LI PT

2001-07-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010511

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES GB IT LI PT

2000-12-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI