Global Patent Index - EP 1059243 A2

EP 1059243 A2 2000-12-13 - Easy open package

Title (en)

Easy open package

Title (de)

Leicht zu öffnende Verpackung

Title (fr)

Emballage à ouverture facile

Publication

EP 1059243 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00304198 A

Priority

US 31481399 A

Abstract (en)

An easy-open package has at least one permanent seal and at least one peelable (i.e., easy-open) seal. In one embodiment, an easy-open package having a peelable heat seal and a permanent heat seal is made from a multilayer film having a first outer layer comprising a first composition which is heat sealable to form a peelable heat seal, and a second outer layer comprising a second composition heat sealable to form a permanent heat seal. The multilayer film is folded inward at one or more seal regions, so that the package has a least one peelable seal and at least one permanent seal. In another embodiment, an inside component film is laminated to an outside component film, with the inside component film providing a majority of the inside surface of the package. The outside component film provides a remainder of the inside surface of the package. The inside film has an inside layer which comprises a composition heat sealed to itself to form a permanent heat seal. The outside film has an inside layer heat sealed to itself or the inside layer of the inside film to form a peelable heat seal. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 75/20; B65D 75/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 75/20 (2006.01); B65D 75/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 75/30 (2013.01); B65D 75/20 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1059243 A2 20001213; EP 1059243 A3 20010314

INPADOC legal status


2002-01-16 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Date of withdrawal: 20010928

2001-12-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2001-10-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010831

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2000-12-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI