Global Patent Index - EP 1059244 A2

EP 1059244 A2 2000-12-13 - Package for potato chips

Title (en)

Package for potato chips

Title (de)

Verpackung für Kartoffelchips

Title (fr)

Emballage pour des pommes de terre chips

Publication

EP 1059244 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00112383 A

Priority

DE 29910029 U

Abstract (en)

The packing consists of a cylindrical container (2) which has a base (4) and a shoulder (6), where the shoulder projects over the base. A container (16) for dip sauce is provided which has a removable lid (8), whereby the lid is designed so that it is releasably held between the base and the shoulder of the container.

Abstract (de)

Die vorliegende Erfindung betrifft eine Verpackung für Kartoffelchips oder dgl. Snacks, die eine im wesentlichen zylindrische Dose aufweist, die auch als Runddose bezeichnet wird. Derartige Runddosen eignen sich insbesondere zur Aufnahme von gleichgeformter Kartoffelchips, aber auch zur Aufnahme von andersartigem Knabbergebäck. Die Dose weist regelmäßig einen Boden und eine den Boden randseitig einfassende Schulter auf, wobei die Schulter über den Boden übersteht. Auf diese Weise wird endseitig eine wannenartige Vertiefung gebildet.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 81/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 81/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 81/3205 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29910029 U1 19990826; EP 1059244 A2 20001213; EP 1059244 A3 20030618

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031219

2004-04-15 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-03-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI