Global Patent Index - EP 1059244 A3

EP 1059244 A3 2003-06-18 - Package for potato chips

Title (en)

Package for potato chips

Title (de)

Verpackung für Kartoffelchips

Title (fr)

Emballage pour des pommes de terre chips

Publication

EP 1059244 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00112383 A

Priority

DE 29910029 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1059244A2] The packing consists of a cylindrical container (2) which has a base (4) and a shoulder (6), where the shoulder projects over the base. A container (16) for dip sauce is provided which has a removable lid (8), whereby the lid is designed so that it is releasably held between the base and the shoulder of the container.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 81/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 81/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 81/3205 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29910029 U1 19990826; EP 1059244 A2 20001213; EP 1059244 A3 20030618

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-15 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031219

2004-04-15 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-03-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI