Global Patent Index - EP 1059251 A1

EP 1059251 A1 2000-12-13 - Device for controlling a continuously working stack lifting device

Title (en)

Device for controlling a continuously working stack lifting device

Title (de)

Einrichtung zum Steuern einer kontinuierlich arbeitenden Stapelhebevorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour contrôler un dispositif de levage de piles travaillant en continu

Publication

EP 1059251 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99107713 A

Priority

EP 99107713 A

Abstract (en)

The stack lifting device has a stack lifting table (8) carrying a stack of paper (7). The table is designed to be able to be lifted and lowered by a controllable drive. The drive can be influenced by a device determining the height of the top side of the paper stack. With the determination of the top of the paper stack at an upper level (20), an upper level signal can be generated and for the height of the top side of the paper stack at a lower level (21), a lower level signal can be generated. The signals can be passed to an evaluation/control unit controlling the drive. The stack lifting device can be lifted after switch-on up to the release of the upper level signal and the top side of the paper stack can be lowered by delivery of the sheets until the lower level signal is released. The time between the release of the upper and lower signals can be determined in the evaluation/control unit. After the release of the lower level signal, the stack lifting table can be lifted until the second release of the upper level signal. A lifting speed can be determined in the evaluation/control unit from the time and height difference between the upper and lower levels. The lifting speed can be tracked after the second release of the upper level signal of the actual machine speed of the paper-processing machine.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Einrichtung zum Steuern einer kontinuierlich arbeitenden Stapelhebevorrichtung einer bogenverarbeitenden Maschine, bei welcher die Stapelhebevorrichtung einen regelbaren Antrieb aufweist, der durch eine die Höhenlage der Oberseite des Bogenstapels erfassenden Einrichtung (15) beeinflußbar ist. Aufgabe der Erfindung ist es, eine gattungsgemäße Stapelhebevorrichtung zu schaffen, mit der auf einfache Weise eine kontinuierliche, den jeweiligen Bedingungen angpaßte Hubgeschwindigkeit des Stapelhubtischs (8) realisiert werden kann. Erfindungsgemäß wird die Aufgabe dadurch gelöst, daß aus einer zwischen einem oberen und einem unteren Niveau (20,21) der Oberseite des Bogenstapels (7) liegenden Höhendifferenz (s) und der zum Abfördern der in diesem Bereich befindlichen Bogen erforderlichen Zeit eine Stapelhubgeschwindigkeit ermittelt wird, die der aktuellen Maschinengeschwindigkeit nachgeführt wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 1/14; B65H 1/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 1/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 1/18 (2013.01); B65H 2511/20 (2013.01); B65H 2513/10 (2013.01); B65H 2513/514 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. B65H 2511/20 + B65H 2220/01
  2. B65H 2513/10 + B65H 2220/02
  3. B65H 2513/514 + B65H 2220/02

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1059251 A1 20001213; EP 1059251 B1 20011219; DE 59900591 D1 20020131

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160423

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160425

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160607

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-09-16 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: KOENIG & BAUER AG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: KOENIG & BAUER AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, 97080 WUERZBURG, DE

- Document: DE 59900591

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-05-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-04-17 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020326

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59900591 20020131

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2001-03-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010209

2000-12-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991122

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-12-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI