Global patent index - EP 1059252 A1

EP 1059252 A1 2000-12-13 - Device for controlling a continuously working stack lift

Title (en)

Device for controlling a continuously working stack lift

Title (de)

Einrichtung zum Steuern einer kontinuierlich arbeitenden stapelhebevorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour contrôler un élévateur de piles travaillant en continu

Publication

EP 1059252 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99107714 A

Priority

EP 99107714 A

Abstract (en)

The detector (15) operates between upper (20) and lower (21) limits of stack (7) height. Its signal is stored in the evaluation and control unit (17), which operates a motor (10) controller (18), hence controlling stack lifting. A further sensor (22) detects stack level below the lower limit (21), generating a further signal to the controller (17). Canceling of the stored control signal adjusts motor drive to a mean level.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Einrichtung zum Steuern einer kontinuierlich arbeitenden Stapelhebevorrichtung einer bogenverarbeitenden Maschine, bei welcher die Stapelhebevorrichtung einen regelbaren Antrieb aufweist, der durch eine die Höhenlage der Oberseite des Bogenstapels erfassenden Einrichtung (15) beeinflußbar ist. Aufgabe der Erfindung ist es, eine gattungsgemäße Stapelhebevorrichtung zu schaffen, mit der auf einfache Weise eine kontinuierliche, den jeweiligen Bedingungen angepaßte Hubgeschwindigkeit des Stapelhubtischs (8) realisiert werden kann.Erfindungsgemäß wird die Aufgabe dadurch gelöst, daß die Stapelhebevorrichtung durch ein die Höhenlage der Oberseite des Bogenstapels in einem Bereich zwischen einem oberen (20) und einem unteren Niveau (21) erfassenden Einrichtung (15) beeinflußbar ist und zusätzliche Mittel (22) vorgesehen sind, die die Höhenlage der Oberseite des Bogenstapels (7) in einem unter dem unteren Niveau (21) liegenden Bereich erfassen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 1/18; B65H 1/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 1/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 1/18 (2013.01); B65H 2511/20 (2013.01); B65H 2513/10 (2013.01); B65H 2557/23 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. B65H 2511/20 + B65H 2220/01
  2. B65H 2513/10 + B65H 2220/02

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1059252 A1 20001213; EP 1059252 B1 20020306; DE 59900930 D1 20020411

INPADOC legal status

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160423

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160607

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160425

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-08-25 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: KOENIG & BAUER AG, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59900930

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2003-02-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20021209

2002-08-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-06-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020530

2002-04-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59900930

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-04-11

2002-03-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2001-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010314

2000-12-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991122

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-12-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI