Global Patent Index - EP 1059253 A1

EP 1059253 A1 2000-12-13 - Device for controlling a continuously working stack lift

Title (en)

Device for controlling a continuously working stack lift

Title (de)

Einrichtung zum Steuern einer kontinuierlich arbeitenden Stapelhebevorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour contrôler un élévateur de piles travaillant en continu

Publication

EP 1059253 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99107715 A

Priority

EP 99107715 A

Abstract (en)

The stack lifting device has a controllable drive which can be influenced by a device (15) determining the height of the top side of the paper stack. The driver of the device is a servomotor (19), having an electrical gear factor adjustment. This adjustment can be implemented in steps of different sizes. The selection of step size takes place according to the height of the top side of the paper stack.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Einrichtung zum Steuern einer kontinuierlich arbeitenden Stapelhebevorrichtung einer bogenverarbeitenden Maschine, bei welcher die Stapelhebevorrichtung einen regelbaren Antrieb aufweist, der durch eine die Höhenlage der Oberseite des Bogenstapels erfassenden Einrichtung beeinflußbar ist. Aufgabe der Erfindung ist es, eine gattungsgemäße Stapelhebevorrichtung zu schaffen, mit der auf einfache Weise eine kontinuierliche, den jeweiligen Bedingungen angepaßte Hubgeschwindigkeit des Stapelhubtischs realisiert werden kann. Erfindungsgemäß wird die Aufgabe dadurch gelöst, daß der Antrieb der Stapelhebevorrichtung mittels eines eine elektrische Getriebefaktorverstellung aufweisenden Servomotors erfolgt, wobei der Getriebefaktor durch eine die Höhenlage des Bogenstapels erfassenden Einrichtung beeinflußbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 1/18; B65H 1/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 1/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 1/18 (2013.01); B65H 2511/22 (2013.01); B65H 2513/10 (2013.01); B65H 2513/20 (2013.01); B65H 2555/24 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. B65H 2511/22 + B65H 2220/01
  2. B65H 2513/10 + B65H 2220/02
  3. B65H 2513/20 + B65H 2220/02

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1059253 A1 20001213; EP 1059253 B1 20020731; DE 59902184 D1 20020905

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170502

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170424

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170531

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-05-02 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-08-25 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: KOENIG & BAUER AG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: KOENIG & BAUER AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, 97080 WUERZBURG, DE

- Document: DE 59902184

2005-08-31 [27C] TERMINATION OF OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

- Effective date: 20050304

2003-06-25 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCHINEN AG

- Effective date: 20030430

2003-02-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-12-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021113

2002-09-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59902184 20020905

2002-07-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-07-31 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2001-02-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001215

2000-12-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991122

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-12-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI