Global patent index - EP 1059375 A1

EP 1059375 A1 2000-12-13 - Thread braking device for weft feeder, having reduced intervention times

Title (en)

Thread braking device for weft feeder, having reduced intervention times

Title (de)

Fadenbremse für eine Schussfadenliefervorrichtung mit reduzierten Eingriffszeiten

Title (fr)

Frein de fil pour fournisseur de trame avec des temps d'intervention réduits

Publication

EP 1059375 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00110983 A

Priority

IT TO990459 A

Abstract (en)

A thread braking device for weft feeder (1), comprising a braking means (2,3) which is supported frontally and coaxially with respect to a drum of a weft feeder in order to directly or indirectly engage the thread that unwinds from the drum, the braking means (2,3) being actuated by at least one linear motor (M) which allows the mutual approach or spacing of the braking means with respect to the drum in order to modulate the braking of the weft thread. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03D 47/34; B65H 51/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 51/22 (2006.01); D03D 47/34 (2006.01); D03D 47/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03D 47/364 (2013.01); D03D 47/34 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1059375 A1 20001213; EP 1059375 B1 20030917; EP 1059375 B2 20090429; DE 60005244 D1 20031023; DE 60005244 T2 20040701; DE 60005244 T3 20091029; IT 1308067 B1 20011129; IT TO990459 A1 20001201

INPADOC legal status

2016-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160526

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160526

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160526

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100531

2011-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100531

2010-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2009-10-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090428

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-06-16 [REG SE RPEO] EP PATENT HAS BEEN REPUBLISHED IN MODIFIED FORM AFTER OPPOSITION AT EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: RPEO

2009-04-30 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: AEN

- Free Format Text: AUFRECHTERHALTUNG DES PATENTES IN GEAENDERTER FORM

2009-04-29 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27A

- Effective date: 20090429

2009-04-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE LI SE

2004-09-01 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: IRO ABSTOCKMAIR & SCHWANHAEUSSERANWALTSSOZIET

- Effective date: 20040617

2004-08-11 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: IRO AB

- Effective date: 20040617

2003-10-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: ROTTMANN, ZIMMERMANN + PARTNER AG

2003-10-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60005244

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-10-23

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-09-23 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2003-09-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE LI SE

2003-09-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: ZENONI, PIETRO

2003-09-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: PEDRINI, GIOVANNI

2003-09-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: CASTELLI, ROSARIO

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: BE CH DE LI SE

2001-08-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010611

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE LI SE

2000-12-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI