Global Patent Index - EP 1059377 A1

EP 1059377 A1 2000-12-13 - Suction device for a textile machine, in particular for a hydroentangling machine

Title (en)

Suction device for a textile machine, in particular for a hydroentangling machine

Title (de)

Absaugvorrichtung an einer Textilmaschine wie insbesondere an einer Wasservernadelungseinrichtung

Title (fr)

Système d'aspiration destiné à une machine textile, en particulier à un dispositif d'aiguilletage hydraulique

Publication

EP 1059377 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00111771 A

Priority

DE 19925703 A

Abstract (en)

A water jet needle punching unit has a support drum (1) for the fabric (2), with a stationary suction tube (5) to remove the water from the needle jets (4). The width of the suction slot (9) is set by slide rails (7,8). A removable cleaning rail (10) is inserted between the slide rails (7,8) from the side and rests on the suction tube (5). It has holes which do not align with the holes in the suction tube (5).

Abstract (de)

Der Absaugschlitz zwischen zwei Gleitleisten für eine das Textilgut transportierende Transporteinrichtung ist ausgefüllt mit einer Reinigungsleiste, die einerseits Löcher für den Abtransport der abzusaugenden Flüssigkeit und vorzugsweise auch andererseits auf der Oberseite eine Trennleiste aufweist zur Bestimmung der Breite des Absaugschlitzes. Auf diese Weise legen sich die durch das Vernadeln gelösten Fasern auf die Stege der Löcher in der Reinigungsleiste und nicht auf die Stege der Öffnungen des Absaugrohres und können so durch Austausch der Reinigungsleiste schnell aus der Absaugvorrichtung entfernt werden. Auch kann die Breite des wirksamen Absaugschlitzes schnell durch Austausch einer anderen Reinigungsleiste verändert werden, in der die Breite von einer oder zwei Trennleisten entsprechend dimensioniert ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D04H 1/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D04H 17/00 (2006.01); D04H 18/04 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04H 18/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19925703 A1 20001207; EP 1059377 A1 20001213; EP 1059377 B1 20050803; JP 2001020172 A 20010123; JP 4395240 B2 20100106; US 6412140 B1 20020702

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160627

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-06-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-05-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130603

2012-09-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120621

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090603

2010-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-02-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090603

2010-01-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080630

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20080627

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-07-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060504

2006-04-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-11-30 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20051108

2005-09-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50010862 P 20050908

2005-08-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-08-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2005-08-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-03-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050121

2004-05-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FLEISSNER GMBH

2004-05-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: FLEISSNER, GEROLD

2002-08-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FLEISSNER GMBH & CO. MASCHINENFABRIK

2002-08-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: FLEISSNER GMBH & CO. MASCHINENFABRIK

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001102

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-12-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI