Global Patent Index - EP 1059381 A1

EP 1059381 A1 2000-12-13 - Rotor for a pulper

Title (en)

Rotor for a pulper

Title (de)

Rotor für eine Papierstoffaufbereitungsmaschine

Title (fr)

Rotor pour un pulpeur

Publication

EP 1059381 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99111193 A

Priority

EP 99111193 A

Abstract (en)

The rotor (1), for the preparation of a paper pulp suspension, has a fitted wear protection cover (5), with a base body and at least one wear-protection working surface (7) and a rear surface, welded to the rotor blade (3). The wear-protection working surface (7) is formed by welding a wear-protection material before the base body is welded to the rotor blade (3). At least the initial section of the leading rotor blade surface (4), at the blade tip, is wholly shrouded by the protective cover (5). The fitted wear protection cover (5) at the rotor blade (3) projects over the side of the rotor blade (3) towards the base of the pulp container, over the leading surface (4) of the blade (3). The end side of the protective cover (5), at the side of the rotor blade (3) towards the pulp container wall, lies at an angle of 1-45 degrees , and is chamfered so that the radial gap between the end side and the rotary axis of the rotor increases towards the container wall. The leading blade surface (4) has the shape of a cylindrical or conical ring segment. The base of the protective shrouding has the shape of a cylindrical or conical ring segment. The protective working surface (7) has at least one leading edge, extending forwards in the direction of rotor (1) rotation. The leading edge has a curvature radius of max. 2 mm.

Abstract (de)

Der Rotor (1) ist zum Einsatz in einer Papierstoffaufbereitungsmaschine, z.B. Stofflöser, bestimmt, insbesondere um die darin enthaltene Papierstoffsuspension umzuwälzen. Dabei kann auch eine weitere Zerkleinerung des suspendierten Papiers bezweckt werden. Der Rotor ist mit Rotorflügeln (3) ausgestattet, welche jeweils mit mindestens einem Verschleißschutzelement (5) versehen sind. Ein solches Verschleißschutzelement (5) besteht aus einem Grundkörper mit einer verschleißgeschützten Arbeitsfläche (7) und ist an den Rotorflügel (3) angeschweißt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21B 1/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21B 1/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21B 1/347 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1059381 A1 20001213; EP 1059381 B1 20040421; CA 2311018 A1 20001209; DE 10016560 A1 20001214; DE 59909240 D1 20040527; US 6705554 B1 20040316

INPADOC legal status


2013-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130101

2013-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120609

2013-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120702

2013-04-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130101

2013-04-18 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59909240

- Effective date: 20130101

2013-03-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130228

2013-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120609

2013-02-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120609

2013-01-16 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130101

2011-12-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110624

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-09-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110622

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110620

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20110621

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-07-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110630

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-09-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20060214

2006-07-19 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20060214

2005-07-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: ANDRITZ AG

2005-05-18 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: ANDRITZ AG

- Effective date: 20050118

2005-05-11 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: ANDRITZ AG

- Effective date: 20050118

2005-05-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: ANDRITZ AG

2005-03-16 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: ANDRITZ AG

- Effective date: 20050118

2004-11-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-05-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59909240 P 20040527

2004-05-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040421

2004-04-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2004-04-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-10-15 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: ROTOR FOR A PULPER

2003-05-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030411

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT NL

2001-08-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010613

2001-04-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2000-12-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI