Global Patent Index - EP 1059386 A1

EP 1059386 A1 2000-12-13 - Masking disc with absorbent pad

Title (en)

Masking disc with absorbent pad

Title (de)

Maskierungsscheibe mit absorbierenden Belag

Title (fr)

Disque de masquage avec plaquette absorbante

Publication

EP 1059386 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99106873 A

Priority

EP 99106873 A

Abstract (en)

A masking disc assembly, suitable for use with a paint line marker (10) which sprays paint onto a surface (25), includes a disc (24) with a front face (58) which is exposed to paint sprayed from the marker toward the surface. An absorbent pad (62) mounted to the disc front face (58) absorbs paint over spray from the paint line marker to provide a crisp paint line on the surface. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01C 23/22; B05B 15/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 15/04 (2006.01); B65D 83/16 (2006.01); E01C 23/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 83/203 (2013.01); B05B 15/0443 (2013.01); B65D 83/267 (2013.01); E01C 23/227 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1059386 A1 20001213; EP 1059386 B1 20041020; DE 69921302 D1 20041125; DE 69921302 T2 20050324

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070407

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060502

2007-03-09 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20061230

2006-12-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060407

2006-11-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061101

2006-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060430

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-04-07 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060407

2005-10-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050721

2005-08-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-04-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050408

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-04-06 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050406

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-03-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050331

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-11-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69921302 P 20041125

2004-10-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-10-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-03-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030115

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2000-12-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000321

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-12-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI