Global patent index - EP 1059388 A3

EP 1059388 A3 2001-03-07 - Road tunnel

Title (en)

Road tunnel

Title (de)

Strassentunnel

Title (fr)

Tunnel routier

Publication

EP 1059388 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00111745 A

Priority

DE 19925932 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19925932A1] The road tunnel is a pipe (1) large enough to take a number of traffic lanes. A vertical and stable wall (4) divides the traffic lanes into two half-sections (5,6) of the tunnel pipe (1). The dividing wall (4) has sections which can be dismantled, and emergency exit doors (8).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E02D 29/045

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01F 15/02 (2006.01); E21D 9/14 (2006.01); E21D 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01F 15/02 (2013.01); E21D 9/14 (2013.01); E21D 11/003 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19925932 A1 20000210; DE 19925932 C2 20001019; EP 1059388 A2 20001213; EP 1059388 A3 20010307

INPADOC legal status

2003-07-23 [R18D] EP-APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN: (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R18D

- Effective date: 20030103

2003-07-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20021231

2002-10-30 [R17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R17P

- Effective date: 20010907

2002-06-27 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-05-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TOENNISSEN, ILSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-11-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT CH FR IT LI

2001-11-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010911

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH FR IT LI

2000-12-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI