Global Patent Index - EP 1059392 A2

EP 1059392 A2 2000-12-13 - Portable device for unblocking pipes, typically the waste pipes of sinks and the like

Title (en)

Portable device for unblocking pipes, typically the waste pipes of sinks and the like

Title (de)

Tragbare Vorrichtung zum Entstopfen von Rohren, insbesondere Abwasserrohre von Spülbecken und dergleichen

Title (fr)

Dispositif portatif pour déboucher des tuyaux, en particulier des tuyaux d'évacuation des éviers et similaires

Publication

EP 1059392 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00201962 A

Priority

IT RE990025 U

Abstract (en)

The device comprises an air receiver (7) having its inlet connected to a manually operated pumping unit (3, 33) for its filling with compressed atmospheric air, between said pumping unit and said receiver (7) there being interposed a valve unit comprising a non-return valve (77) positioned to intercept the delivery conduit of said pumping unit; a valving element (10) slidingly housed air-tight inside a passage chamber (12) into which said delivery conduit opens, and arranged to close the outlet of the receiver (7); a vent valve (24), controlled by a trigger operable from the outside, to intercept a channel (25) which connects said passage chamber (12) to the outside; and a duct (11) which passes through said valving element (10) and has one end constantly connected to said passage chamber (12) and its other end opening into the outer cylindrical surface of the valving element (10); said valving element (10) is provided with elastic means (15) arranged to maintain the valving element (10) constantly urged towards its closure position, the thrust of said elastic means (15) being overcome by the thrust produced by the pressure downstream of the valving element (10) when the passage chamber (12) is connected to discharge. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E03C 1/304; B05B 11/00; B08B 9/032; F04B 33/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B08B 9/02 (2006.01); E03C 1/304 (2006.01); F04B 33/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B08B 9/0321 (2013.01); E03C 1/304 (2013.01); F04B 33/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1059392 A2 20001213; EP 1059392 A3 20030416; IT 248258 Y1 20021216; IT RE990025 U1 20001211

INPADOC legal status


2004-08-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030917

2004-02-12 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-01-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-04-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-04-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI