Global patent index - EP 1059399 A1

EP 1059399 A1 2000-12-13 - Cross-shaped spacer

Title (en)

Cross-shaped spacer

Title (de)

Fugenkreuz

Title (fr)

Entretoise en croix

Publication

EP 1059399 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99110942 A

Priority

EP 99110942 A

Abstract (en)

The joining cross has three or more arms (1, 2, 3) projecting at angles from a common foot area with at least one (1) tapering towards the foot area to form an ideal break point (5) with the other two which are each set back at this ideal break point behind the fitting width. At least one of the arms has a hollowed area (10). At least one arm has a thickened area (6, 7) in the fitting width which can form a linear abutment for the tiles.

Abstract (de)

Ein Fugenkreuz zum Festlegen von Fugen beim Verlegen von Fliesen oder Platten weist wenigstens drei Schenkel (1, 2, 3) auf, die in einem gemeinsamen Fußbereich winklig voneinander abragen und je eine Passbreite (B1) haben, die einer Fugenbreite zwischen den Fliesen oder Platten entspricht. Ein erster Schenkel (1) der wenigsten drei Schenkel (1, 2, 3) ist zu dem Fußbereich hin verjüngt. Dadurch ist eine Sollbruchstelle (5) zu den beiden anderen Schenkeln (2, 3) ausgebildet. Jeder der beiden anderen Schenkel (2, 3) ist an der Sollbruchstelle (5) hinter seine Passbreite (B1) zurückgenommen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04F 21/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04F 21/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04F 21/0092 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 4439647 C2 19970904 - KILIAN HEINZ [DE]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1059399 A1 20001213; EP 1059399 B1 20050302; AT 290143 T 20050315; DE 59911698 D1 20050407

INPADOC legal status

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150619

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110630

2012-03-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20120229

2010-07-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100706

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-01-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050602

2006-03-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2006-02-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20051205

2005-09-28 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20050302

2005-09-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2005-06-07 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050607

2005-04-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59911698

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-04-07

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-03-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

2005-03-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-03-02 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050302

2005-03-02 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050302

2005-03-02 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050302

2005-03-02 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050302

2004-04-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20031104

2002-10-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SCHULTE, HERBERT

2002-10-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: KILIAN, HEINZ

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

2001-05-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010315

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

2000-12-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI