Global patent index - EP 1059423 A2

EP 1059423 A2 2000-12-13 - Valve driving apparatus for internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Valve driving apparatus for internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Ventiltrieb für eine Verbrennungskraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Commande de soupapes pour un moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 1059423 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00111830 A

Priority

  • JP 15892899 A
  • JP 16655199 A
  • JP 16655299 A

Abstract (en)

In a valve driving apparatus using a direct driving type valve lifter which is disposed between a cam formed at a cam shaft and a poppet valve (105) which is provided in a path formed at the cylinder head (111) of an internal combustion engine and moves to the axial direction of the valve to open and close the path, the valve driving apparatus includes a guide hole (123) formed at the cylinder head; and a direct driving type valve lifter having a tappet portion (103) which is brought in contact with the cam and pressed by the cam (102), and a guide portion (104) having one end portion coupled to the tappet portion (103) and housed within the guide hole (123) so as to slide freely therein to the axial direction of the poppet valve (105) in an interlocked manner as a pushing operation of the tappet portion by the cam, wherein the diameter of the guide portion (104) is formed to be smaller than the diameter of the tappet portion (103).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01L 1/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01L 1/00 (2006.01); F01L 1/14 (2006.01); F01M 9/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01M 9/104 (2013.01); F01L 1/14 (2013.01); F01L 1/143 (2013.01); F01M 9/10 (2013.01); F01L 2810/02 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

JP H10331709 A 19981215 - SUZUKI MOTOR CO

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1059423 A2 20001213; EP 1059423 A3 20010314; EP 1059423 B1 20040331; CN 1128922 C 20031126; CN 1276467 A 20001213; CN 1312382 C 20070425; CN 1515787 A 20040728; DE 60009386 D1 20040506; DE 60009386 T2 20050310; EP 1336725 A2 20030820; EP 1336725 A3 20031112; KR 100466882 B1 20050124; KR 20020071490 A 20020912; MY 141693 A 20100615; TW 445342 B 20010711

INPADOC legal status

2013-06-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090611

- Year of fee payment: 10

2011-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100607

2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100630

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110101

2011-03-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20110228

2011-02-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20100607

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090604

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090603

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-07-27 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Ref Legal Event Code: CA

2005-03-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050104

2004-12-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-05-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60009386

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-05-06

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-03-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-03-31 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2002-04-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020227

2001-12-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2001-09-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010716

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7F 01L 1/14 A, 7F 02F 1/42 B, 7F 01L 1/26 B

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-12-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI