Global Patent Index - EP 1059424 A2

EP 1059424 A2 2000-12-13 - Method for cooling electromagnetic valve actuators in an internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Method for cooling electromagnetic valve actuators in an internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Kühlung von elektromagnetischen Aktuatoren für Brennkraftmaschinen-Hubventile

Title (fr)

Procédé de refroidissement d'actionneurs electromagnétiques de moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 1059424 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00111426 A

Priority

DE 19926412 A

Abstract (en)

The method involves passing a part of a fluid flow circulating in the engine, esp. lubricating oil, through each actuator. The quantity of fluid passing through the actuator is variable and is controlled with a valve arrangement so that the critical component temp. of the actuators is not exceeded.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zur Kühlung von elektromagnetischen Betätigungsvorrichtungen für Brennkraftmaschinen-Hubventile, wobei durch jede elektromagnetische Betätigungsvorrichtung (=Aktuator) ein Teil eines in der Brennkraftmaschine umgewälzten Fluidstromes, insbesondere Schmierölstromes, hindurch geleitet wird. Die Menge des durch den/die Aktuator(en) hindurch geleiteten Fluidstromes ist veränderbar und wird mittels einer geeigneten Ventileinrichtung derart eingestellt, daß letztlich die kritische Bauteiltemperatur der Aktuatoren nicht überschritten wird. Bevorzugt wird eine der aktuellen Bauteiltemperatur entsprechende elektrische Kenngröße eines Aktuators in einer den Aktuatoren zugeordneten elektronischen Steuereinheit anhand des durch die Magnetspulen des Aktuators fließenden elektrischen Stromes ermittelt und in einer elektronischen Steuereinheit mit der kritischen Bauteiltemperatur oder einer dieser entsprechenden kritischen elektrischen Kenngröße verglichen, woraufhin die letztgenannte Steuereinheit die Ventileinrichtung im Hinblick auf den erforderlichen Kühl-Fluidstrom ansteuert.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01L 9/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01L 9/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01L 9/04 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1059424 A2 20001213; EP 1059424 A3 20010418; EP 1059424 B1 20040728; DE 19926412 A1 20001221; DE 19926412 B4 20040715; ES 2222134 T3 20050201; US 6318312 B1 20011120

INPADOC legal status


2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090527

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090526

2010-10-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090527

2010-07-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090527

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091201

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090526

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090602

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080428

- Year of fee payment: 9

2010-02-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100129

2010-01-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090526

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080529

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080709

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-10-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20080509

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080529

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080430

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-07-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050429

2005-03-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-02-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2222134 T3

2004-11-16 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-10-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040916

2004-09-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50007177 P 20040902

2004-07-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2004-07-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031117

2002-01-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT SE

2001-07-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010511

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2000-12-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI