Global Patent Index - EP 1059456 A2

EP 1059456 A2 2000-12-13 - Side channel compressor

Title (en)

Side channel compressor

Title (de)

Seitenkanalverdichter

Title (fr)

Compresseur à canal latéral

Publication

EP 1059456 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00112499 A

Priority

DE 19926777 A

Abstract (en)

The device has a rotor wheel (2) and a housing with a side channel formed in it. The rotor wheel has blades and inlets (3) and outlets (4) opening into the side channel with flows into and out of a plane perpendicular to the rotor wheel's rotation plane. Two or more inlets and outlets are distributed peripherally about the rotor wheel, which turns at a rate of greater than 100 Hz.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Seitenkanalverdichter (1) mit einem Laufrad (2), einem Gehäuse, wobei in dem Gehäuse ein Seitenkanal ausgebildet ist und das Laufrad (2) Schaufeln aufweist, und mit in den Seitenkanal mündenden Ein- und Auslässen mit Zu- und Abströmungen aus/in einer Ebene senkrecht zur Rotationsebene des Laufrades (2). Um eine möglichst hohe Leistung zu erreichen schlägt die Erfindung vor, daß über den Umfang verteilt bezüglich eines Laufrades zwei oder mehr Ein- und Auslässe ausgebildet sind und daß das Laufrad mit einer Frequenz von mehr als 100 Hz umläuft. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04D 23/00; F04D 29/58

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 23/00 (2006.01); F04D 29/58 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 29/584 (2013.01); F04D 23/008 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1059456 A2 20001213; EP 1059456 A3 20020102; DE 19926777 A1 20001214

INPADOC legal status


2008-06-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20071212

2007-07-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070601

2002-10-24 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-10-16 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB IT LI

2002-09-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY LI

2002-06-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020404

2002-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB IT LI

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI