Global Patent Index - EP 1059458 A2

EP 1059458 A2 2000-12-13 - Fluid power control device

Title (en)

Fluid power control device

Title (de)

Fluidtechnisches Steuergerät

Title (fr)

Dispositif de commande fluidique

Publication

EP 1059458 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00104940 A

Priority

DE 29909529 U

Abstract (en)

The fluid power devices used for machine control are produced as modules (2,6,9) that are stacked in series. Some of the devices will be valves and some are electronic modules (7). Fluid interconnections are provided between the individual devices with a central supply line (25). Silencers are provided for the exhaust air.

Abstract (de)

Es wird ein fluidtechnisches Steuergerät vorgeschlagen, das mehrere in einer Reihenrichtung (3) aufeinanderfolgend angeordnete und zu einer batterieartigen Einheit (4) zusammengefaßte Einzelgeräte (2) verschiedener Gerätearten enthält. Die Einzelgeräte (2) sind zumindest teilweise als Fluidgeräte (6) ausgebildet. Ihre Gerätegehäuse (5) verfügen, bei mit der Reihenrichtung (3) übereinstimmender Blickrichtung gesehen, über eine zumindest im wesentlichen identische Außenkontur. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F15B 13/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F15B 13/00 (2006.01); F15B 13/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 13/0839 (2013.01); F15B 13/0814 (2013.01); F15B 13/0825 (2013.01); F15B 13/0853 (2013.01); F15B 13/0857 (2013.01); F15B 13/086 (2013.01); F15B 13/0867 (2013.01); F15B 13/0889 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 29909529 U1 19990812; DE 50012712 D1 20060614; EP 1059458 A2 20001213; EP 1059458 A3 20031015; EP 1059458 B1 20060510; ES 2259583 T3 20061016

INPADOC legal status


2013-09-26 [REG DE R107] PUBLICATION OF GRANT OF EUROPEAN PATENT RESCINDED

- Document: DE 50012712

- Effective date: 20130926

2013-05-08 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20121214

2012-12-14 [REG DE R064] EPO'S REVOCATION DECISION NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 50012712

2012-12-14 [REG DE R103] PATENT REVOKED BY EPO

- Document: DE 50012712

2012-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20111215

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080310

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080308

2009-05-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20080310

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2008-12-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20081125

2008-11-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080308

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070321

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-03-14 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: BUERKERT WERKE GMBH & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20070206

2007-03-06 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070306

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-03-02 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20070302

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-12-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2259583 T3

2006-06-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50012712 P 20060614

2006-05-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060510

2006-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2006-05-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-05-10 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060510

2004-07-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-05-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040325

2004-01-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031106

2003-10-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-10-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI