Global Patent Index - EP 1059483 A2

EP 1059483 A2 2000-12-13 - Portable lamp

Title (en)

Portable lamp

Title (de)

Transportable Leuchte

Title (fr)

Lampe portative

Publication

EP 1059483 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00202038 A

Priority

DE 29910204 U

Abstract (en)

The arrangement comprises a textile screen which is stretched through spring rods (4) which are pushed together on a central axis. The springs determine a desired balloon form of the textile screen through positioning a sliding device (3) along the central axis (1). The textile screen is stretched through a tension of the spring rods to a ellipsoid to spherical balloon screen. A socket (2) with a lighting device is located on the central axis.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine transportable Leuchte 1, bestehend aus zumindest einem Leuchtmittel 10, welches in einer Halterung 2 aufgenommen und über eine Zuleitung 12,14 mit Spannung beaufschlagbar ist, wobei das Leuchtmittel 10 einen zumindest teilweise lichtdurchlässigen Leuchtenschirm 3 aufweist. Um eine dauerhafte und sichere Aufspannung des Leuchtenschirms 3 zu erzielen wird erfindungsgemäß vorgeschlagen, dass die Halterung 2 stabförmig ausgebildet und von dem Leuchtenschirm 3 zumindest teilweise umschlossen ist, wobei der Leuchtenschirm 3 durch bewegliche Spannmittel 4 gehalten ist, welche im gebrauchsfähigem Zustand von dem Leuchtmittel 10 weg bewegt, entlang der Wölbung des Leuchtenschirms 3 anliegen. Durch diese erfindungsgemäße Ausführung wird bei der Leuchte 1 eine dauerhafte und sichere Aufspannung des Leuchtenschirms 3 unter erschwerten Arbeitsbedingungen erreicht, wobei die Leuchte 1 äußerst robust und unempfindlich gegen Beschädigungen ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21L 14/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21L 14/00 (2006.01); F21S 8/00 (2006.01); F21V 1/06 (2006.01); F21V 1/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21V 1/06 (2013.01); F21L 14/00 (2013.01); F21V 3/023 (2013.01); F21V 17/007 (2013.01); F21W 2131/1005 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0834693 A1 19980408 - AIRSTAR [FR]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29910204 U1 20000323; AT 273481 T 20040815; CA 2311220 A1 20001211; CA 2311220 C 20020521; DE 50007345 D1 20040916; DK 1059483 T3 20041115; EP 1059483 A2 20001213; EP 1059483 A3 20011010; EP 1059483 B1 20040811; ES 2225016 T3 20050316; HK 1036318 A1 20041231; PT 1059483 E 20041029; US 6305827 B1 20011023

INPADOC legal status


2017-06-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160830

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160620

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20160622

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20160530

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160622

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20160622

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20160622

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160628

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-06-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-01-27 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50007345

- Representative's name: SCHUMACHER & WILLSAU PATENTANWALTSGESELLSCHAFT, DE

2005-08-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050512

2005-06-09 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050609

2005-06-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2225016 T3

2004-12-31 [REG HK GR] STANDARD PATENTS GRANTED IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1036318

2004-12-17 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20040403756

2004-11-30 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-11-15 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2004-10-29 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20040908

2004-10-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040913

2004-09-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: TROESCH SCHEIDEGGER WERNER AG

2004-09-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50007345 P 20040916

2004-09-08 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-08-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-08-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-08-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-08-11 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040811

2003-04-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030311

2002-07-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-04-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020116

2001-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI