Global Patent Index - EP 1059491 A2

EP 1059491 A2 2000-12-13 - Distribution manifold for thermal system with forced circulation

Title (en)

Distribution manifold for thermal system with forced circulation

Title (de)

Verteiler für Heizanlage mit gezwungener Umwalzung

Title (fr)

Collecteur de distribution pour système thermale avec circulation forcée

Publication

EP 1059491 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00112477 A

Priority

IT TO990112 U

Abstract (en)

A distribution manifold for forced circulation heating system, of the type being used in heating systems providing a plurality of manifolds (11; 41), each one associated to a different set of heating elements, said manifold (11; 41) being associated through relevant duct and housing elements (17; 47; 75; 85) to valve means (23, 32; 72) apt to put the manifold (11; 41) in communication with the heating system. According to the invention, said distribution manifold (41) is incorporated in a one-piece monoblock (40, 80), also incorporating the duct and housing elements (47;85), which associate said valve means (23, 32; 72) <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24D 3/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24D 3/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24D 3/1066 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1059491 A2 20001213; EP 1059491 A3 20021218; IT TO990112 U1 20001211

INPADOC legal status


2004-03-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030618

2003-10-16 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-09-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-12-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI