Global Patent Index - EP 1059498 A1

EP 1059498 A1 2000-12-13 - Apparatus for raising and lowering the shelves in a freeze drying chamber

Title (en)

Apparatus for raising and lowering the shelves in a freeze drying chamber

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Heben und Senken der Regale eines Gefriertrocknungsraumes

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour relever et abaisser les étagères dans une cuve de lyophilisation

Publication

EP 1059498 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00401541 A

Priority

FR 9907320 A

Abstract (en)

Device comprises number of articulated links comprising longitudinal upper (1) and lower (2) parts freely articulated about spindle (3) and connecting two successive shelves (13,13'). The upper end of upper part forms hinge (6) with one of shelves and lower end of lower part forms hinge (6') with shelf located immediately below. Lower part is made of two identical rectangular plates attached by spindle (3). Upper part consists of long metal plate with oblong hole (4) and skew cut (12) in its lower end. When shelves are lowering, skew cut contacts above part's rounded end and both parts start pivoting.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F26B 5/06; B65B 31/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 31/02 (2006.01); F26B 5/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F26B 5/06 (2013.01); B65B 31/027 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1059498 A1 20001213; FR 2794848 A1 20001215; FR 2794848 B1 20010727

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-29 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041102

2003-03-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030204

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-07-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010514

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI