Global Patent Index - EP 1059502 A2

EP 1059502 A2 2000-12-13 - Method for coating the inner surface of a gun barrel

Title (en)

Method for coating the inner surface of a gun barrel

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Innenbeschichtung eines Waffenrohres

Title (fr)

Procédé pour revêtir la surface interne d'un tube de canon

Publication

EP 1059502 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00107747 A

Priority

DE 19926246 A

Abstract (en)

The method involves applying the coating material by explosive plating, whereby a sheet or foil of coating material (8) is introduced into the barrel (1) so that a gap (10) is left between the surface to be plated and the foil or sheet and an explosive material (7) on the foil or sheet surface away from the barrel surface. The explosive material is ignited to cold weld it onto the barrel.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zur Innenbeschichtung eines Waffenrohres, auf dessen innere Rohroberfläche (4) minde-stens in einem Teilbereich (2) mindestens eine Schicht (20) eines Schichtwerkstoffes zur Vermeidung von Erosionen aufgebracht wird. Um auf einfache Weise hochschmelzende Schichtwerkstoffe auf die innere Rohroberfläche (4) des Waffenrohres (1) aufzubringen, schlägt die Erfindung vor, die Innenbeschichtung des jeweiligen Waffenrohres (1) durch Sprengplattieren vorzunehmen. Dabei wird ein aus dein entsprechenden Schichtwerkstoff bestehendes blech- oder folienförmiges Teil (8) mit einem Sprengstoff (7) versehen und derart in das Waffenrohr (1) eingebracht, daß zwischen der zu plattierenden inneren Rohroberfläche (4) und dem blech- oder folienförmigen Teil (8) ein spaltförmiger Raum (10) verbleibt, so daß nach Zündung des Sprengstoffes (7) die entstehenden Schichtmaterial-Partikel zur Rohroberfläche hin beschleunigt und mit dem Material des Waffenrohres (1) ("kalt"-) verschweißt werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F41A 21/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41A 21/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F41A 21/22 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1059502 A2 20001213; EP 1059502 A3 20010822; DE 19926246 A1 20001214; US 6352740 B1 20020305

INPADOC legal status


2004-05-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031103

2002-05-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-09-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010712

2001-08-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI