Global Patent Index - EP 1059503 A1

EP 1059503 A1 2000-12-13 - Gun mount, launching device on said gun mount, ammunition magazine for said launching device, and use of the launching device

Title (en)

Gun mount, launching device on said gun mount, ammunition magazine for said launching device, and use of the launching device

Title (de)

Lafette, Abschussvorrichtung auf dieser Lafette, Munitionsbehälter für die Abschussvorrichtung und Verwendung der Abschussvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Affût, dispositif de lancement sur cet affût, magasin à munitions pour ledit dispositif de lancement et utilisation du dispositif de lancement

Publication

EP 1059503 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00103127 A

Priority

CH 108499 A

Abstract (en)

The gun carriage has a base (12), a pedestal (14), a first axis (a) perpendicular to the base-pedestal contact surface, a second axis (b) at a constant angle to the first and a firing axis coincident with the barrel axis and at a constant angle to the second axis. The barrel arrangement. and pedestal are in contact with an auxiliary, essentially circular surface perpendicular to the firing axis. The angle (alpha) between the first and second axes is less than 90 degrees. That between the firing axis and second axis is approximately equal to the first angle. Independent claims are also included for a firing device, for a munitions container and for a use of the firing device on a gun carriage.

Abstract (de)

Die Lafette (10) dient zum Richten einer Wirkachse (I), insbesondere einer Abschussrohranordnung. Sie umfasst eine Basis (12) und einen Sockel (14), welcher auf der Basis (12) angeordnet ist und auf welchem die Abschussrohranordnung (16) befestigbar ist. Basis (12) und Sockel (14) berühren sich längs einer ersten Fläche (F1). Eine Achse (a) ist senkrecht zur Fläche (F1) gerichtet, und der Sockel (14) ist relativ zur Basis (12) um die Achse (a) drehbar. Eine Achse (b) schneidet die Achse (a) in einem Achsenschnittpunkt (X) unter einem Winkel () und dreht mit der Basis (14) mit. Die Wirkachse (I) schneidet die Achsen (a) und (b) in einem Schnittpunkt (Y), der mindestens annähernd mit dem Achsenschnittpunkt (X) zusammenfällt und verläuft unter einem Winkel () zur Achse (b). Die Abschussrohranordnung (16) und der Sockel (14) sind über eine weitere Fläche (F2) in Kontakt, welche senkrecht zur Wirkachse (I) verläuft. Der Winkel () ist kleiner als 90°. Der Winkel () ist mindestens annähernd gleich dem Winkel (), so dass die Wirkachse (I) in ihrer Extremallage (I1) mindestens annähernd mit der Achse (a) zusammenfällt. Die Abschussvorrichtung (17) mit der Lafette (10) weist einen Munitionsbehälter (20) auf, welcher bewegungsmässig mit der Abschussrohranordnung (16) gekoppelt ist. Der Munitionsbehälter (20) umgibt vorzugsweise das Zentrum (X) einer Kugel (K) mit Mittelpunkt im Achsenschnittpunkt (X) und/oder weist die Form eines Hohlkugelscheibensektors auf. Die Abschussvorrichtung (17) mit der Lafette (10) eignet sich besonders zur Verwendung auf einem Land-, Luft- oder Seetransportmittel. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F41A 23/24; F41A 27/08; H01Q 1/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41A 23/24 (2006.01); F41A 27/08 (2006.01); H01Q 1/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/125 (2013.01); F41A 23/24 (2013.01); F41A 27/08 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0040871 A2 19811202 - OERLIKON BUEHRLE AG [CH]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1059503 A1 20001213; CH 693687 A5 20031215; ZA 200002324 B 20001116

INPADOC legal status


2002-07-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020108

2001-10-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010827

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001230

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI