Global Patent Index - EP 1059504 A2

EP 1059504 A2 2000-12-13 - Vehicle viewing system

Title (en)

Vehicle viewing system

Title (de)

Beobachtungvorrichtung für ein Fahrzeug

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'observation pour véhicule

Publication

EP 1059504 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00650066 A

Priority

IE 990484 A

Abstract (en)

An armoured vehicle viewing system for a driver of the armoured vehicle (2) comprises a viewing cupola (1) rotatably mounted by a turntable in the vehicle (2). One side wall (4) of the cupola (1) has an enlarged viewing window for improved driver vision in peacetime operation of the vehicle (2). Rotation of the cupola (1) through 180 DEG positions armoured viewing blocks (14,15,16) in opposite side walls (6,7,8) of the cupola (1) in front of the driver to provide ballistic protection to the driver during military actions. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F41H 5/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41H 5/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F41H 5/26 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1059504 A2 20001213; EP 1059504 A3 20020130

INPADOC legal status


2003-05-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-11-21 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-10-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-01-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI