Global Patent Index - EP 1059528 A2

EP 1059528 A2 2000-12-13 - Gassensor using the principle of workfunction

Title (en)

Gassensor using the principle of workfunction

Title (de)

Gassensor nach dem Prinzip der Austrittsarbeitsmessung

Title (fr)

Capteur de gaz sur le principe du potentiel d'extraction

Publication

EP 1059528 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00111575 A

Priority

DE 19926747 A

Abstract (en)

The field effect transistor has a gas-sensitive layer containing titanium.

Abstract (de)

Der Gassensor arbeitet nach dem Prinzip der Messung der Austrittsarbeit zur Bestimmung von Ammoniak und/oder Ammoniak-Derivaten und weist eine gassensitive Schicht (1) auf, die Titan entweder rein oder in einer Verbindung enthält. Anwendung beispielsweise an Kühlanlagen und zur Tiermast. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01N 27/414

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 27/414 (2006.01); G01N 27/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01N 27/4143 (2013.01); G01N 33/0054 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

  • GB 2202948 A 19881005 - ATOMIC ENERGY AUTHORITY UK
  • US 4411741 A 19831025 - JANATA JIRI [US]
  • DE 4239319 A1 19930408 - EISELE IGNAZ PROF DR [DE], et al
  • "WPI", Database accession no. 198243
  • TIAN-HONG ZHANG ET AL.: "Temperature-controlled Kelvin microprobe", SENSORS AND ACTUATORS, B CHEMICAL, vol. 12, no. 3, pages 175 - 180
  • A. FUCHS ET AL.: "Room temperature ozone sensing with KI layers integrated in HSGFET gas sensors", SENSORS AND ACTUATORS, B, BAD., vol. 48, no. 1-3, pages 296 - 299
  • SCHIERBAUM ET AL.: "Defect structure and sensing mechanism of Sn02 gas sensors: Comparative electrical and spectroscopic studies", SOLID STATE IONICS, vol. 28-30, pages 1631 - 1636

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1059528 A2 20001213; EP 1059528 A3 20030102; EP 1059528 B1 20101110; DE 19926747 C1 20010405; DE 50016025 D1 20101223

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160520

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160520

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160520

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20101110

2011-12-08 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 50016025

- Effective date: 20110811

2011-10-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20110811

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110221

2010-12-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50016025 P 20101223

2010-11-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2010-11-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-08-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MICRONAS GMBH

2003-09-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-04-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030203

2003-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-01-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI